Barnstable County Mutual Insurance Company v. BrassCraft Manufacturing Company
Plaintiff: Barnstable County Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: BrassCraft Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv12334
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Jennifer C Boal
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 19 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: A Status Conference is set for June 3, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. A Status Report is due by June 1, 2020. (York, Steve)
December 18, 2019 Filing 18 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Scheduling Conference held on 12/18/2019. The Court reviewed the scheduling plan with the parties. The Court will issue a Scheduling order. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Mena for plaintiff; DiVita & Rossi for defendant;) (York, Steve)
December 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Rossi on behalf of BrassCraft Manufacturing Company (Rossi, Michael)
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel pursuant to L.R. 16.1(d). (Conn, Russell)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by BrassCraft Manufacturing Company. (DiVita, Catherine)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Barnstable County Mutual Insurance Company.(Mena, Rafael)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Barnstable County Mutual Insurance Company. (Mena, Rafael)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 ESI Litigation Hold Notice Letter Letter/request (non-motion) from Barnstable County Mutual Insurnace Company . (Mena, Rafael)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 STATE COURT Record. (Conn, Russell)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. The Initial Scheduling Conference is set for December 18, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (York, Steve)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by BrassCraft Manufacturing Company.. (Conn, Russell)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rafael S. Mena on behalf of Barnstable County Mutual Insurance Company (Mena, Rafael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (York, Steve)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BrassCraft Manufacturing Company.(Conn, Russell)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BrassCraft Manufacturing Company identifying Corporate Parent Masco Corporation for BrassCraft Manufacturing Company.. (Conn, Russell)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine M. DiVita on behalf of BrassCraft Manufacturing Company (DiVita, Catherine)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BrassCraft Manufacturing Company ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7968379 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (Service Documents), #3 Exhibit 3 (Civil Action Cover Sheet & Tracking Order), #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Local Category Sheet)(Conn, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnstable County Mutual Insurance Company v. BrassCraft Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barnstable County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: James T. Buchanan
Represented By: Rafael S. Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BrassCraft Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Catherine M. DiVita
Represented By: Russell F. Conn
Represented By: Michael J. Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?