Gordon-Bey v. Spaulding
Petitioner: John Gordon-Bey
Respondent: Stephen Spaulding
Case Number: 1:2019cv12336
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. On November 12, 2019, John Gordon, an inmate now incarcerated at the Federal Medical Center (FMC) Devens in Ayer, Massachusetts, filed a Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus. See Gordon v. Spaulding, No. 19-12329-IT. He also sent a letter addressed to the undersigned regarding the habeas petition. The Clerk erroneously treated the letter as another habeas petition and opened this action. See Dkt. 1. Accordingly, it is it is hereby ORDERED that1.The Clerk is directed to file Gordons letter and its 39 pages of exhibits in Gordon v. Spaulding, No. 19-12329-IT. 2.The Clerk shall terminate this action on the civil docket.(PSSA, 4)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET SHEET sent to John Gordon-Bey. (Vieira, Leonardo)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore B. Heinrich on behalf of Stephen Spaulding (Heinrich, Theodore)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by John Gordon-Bey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Vieira, Leonardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon-Bey v. Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Spaulding
Represented By: Theodore B. Heinrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Gordon-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?