Chemgenes Corporation v. Richardson et al
Plaintiff: Chemgenes Corporation
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, USCIS, Director Gregory A. Richardson, Acting Secretary Chad Wolf, Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Gregory A. Richardson, Chad Wolf and Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Case Number: 1:2019cv12343
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Gregory A. Richardson, USCIS, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf. (Brizius, Erin)
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Second Assented-To MOTION for Extension of Time to January 6, 2020 to Respond to Plaintiff's #9 Motion to Expedite. (Pacho, Arnold)
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite-Assented To by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Gregory A. Richardson, USCIS, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf.(Brizius, Erin)
December 16, 2019 Filing 15 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Assented to Motion for Extension of time to December 23, 2019 to respond to #9 Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite. (Pacho, Arnold)
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXPEDITE by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Gregory A. Richardson, USCIS, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf.(Brizius, Erin)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Brizius on behalf of Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Gregory A. Richardson, USCIS, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf (Brizius, Erin)
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered reserving ruling on #9 Motion to Expedite. Deferred pending the Government's response.(RGS, law2)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Chemgenes Corporation. US Attorney served on 11/20/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. [Correction to docket made by court staff in order to set answer deadline as to the United States]. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Pacho, Arnold)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Expedite (renewed) Briefing Schedule and for Speedy Hearing filed by Chemgenes Corporation. (O'Connor, Kevin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite (renewed) Briefing Schedule and for Speedy Hearing by Chemgenes Corporation.(O'Connor, Kevin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Chemgenes Corporation. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by Chemgenes Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(O'Connor, Kevin)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered re #2 Motion for Speedy Hearing and Expedited Briefing Schedule. Denied without prejudice in the absence of proof of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Complaint,, Category Sheet by Chemgenes Corporation. (O'Connor, Kevin)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and for Speedy Hearing filed by Chemgenes Corporation. (O'Connor, Kevin)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and for Speedy Hearing by Chemgenes Corporation.(O'Connor, Kevin)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7969822 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Chemgenes Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S)(O'Connor, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chemgenes Corporation v. Richardson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Gregory A. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory A. Richardson
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chemgenes Corporation
Represented By: Kevin J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?