M&G Harbor Services LLC v. Dwyer
Plaintiff: M&G Harbor Services LLC
Defendant: Robert Dwyer
Case Number: 1:2019cv12354
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Counterclaim by M&G Harbor Services LLC.(Smith, David)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff Robert Dwyer's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against M&G Harbor Services LLC by Robert Dwyer.(Joyce, Edward)
December 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Robert Dwyer served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Smith, David)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7972585 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by M&G Harbor Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Smith, David) (Attachment 2 replaced with completed Category Form on 11/18/2019) (Warnock, Douglas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M&G Harbor Services LLC v. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dwyer
Represented By: Edward M. Joyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M&G Harbor Services LLC
Represented By: David S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?