Mullane v. Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Jonathan Mullane
Defendant: Securities and Exchange Commission, Department of Justice, United States Securities and Exchange Commission and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2019cv12379
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by United States Department of Justice, United States Securities and Exchange Commission.(Sady, Michael)
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of United States Department of Justice, United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Sady, Michael)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Related Proceeding (Mullane, E. Peter) Modified on 1/7/2020 (McKillop, Matthew).
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, All Defendants 1/17/20. (Hourihan, Lisa)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 17, 2020 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by United States Department of Justice, United States Securities and Exchange Commission.(Weida, Jason)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Jonathan Mullane Related Proceeding (Mullane, E. Peter)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Jonathan Mullane. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by Jonathan Mullane. (Mullane, E. Peter)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7978825 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jonathan Mullane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Mullane, E. Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullane v. Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securities and Exchange Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Jonathan Mullane
Represented By: E. Peter Mullane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?