Orozco v. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Plaintiff: Luis A. Orozco
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and NewRez, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv12444
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 25 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Scheduling Conference held on 1/15/2020. #22 Joint Statement - ADOPTED.....ORDERED: Plaintiff Disclose experts 7/8/2020; Defendants disclose experts 8/7/2020; Fact/Expert Discovery 10/8/2020; Motion to Dismiss 3/16/2020; Opposition 3/30/2020; Motions for Summary Judgment 11/9/2020; Daubert Motions 1/8/2021. (Atty MacDonald, Atty Townsend) (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.) (Molloy, Maryellen)
January 13, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE: Joint stated was filed on 1/8/2020. 16.b will go forward as scheduled on 1/15/2020 at 2:30pm. (Molloy, Maryellen)
January 13, 2020 Filing 23 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered.....Local Rule 16.1 16.b will go forward as scheduled on Wednesday 1/15/2020 at 2:30pm before Judge Saris in in courtroom #19 7th floor.(Molloy, Maryellen
January 8, 2020 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Townsend, Christopher)
January 8, 2020 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Motion hearing previously scheduled for January 15, 2020 is CANCELED. Scheduling Conference will go forward at same date and time unchanged. (Lara, Miguel)
January 8, 2020 Filing 20 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. "Denied as moot without prejudice." (Lara, Miguel)
January 7, 2020 Filing 19 Opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Luis A. Orozco. (MacDonald, Donald)
January 7, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Luis A. Orozco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage Loan) (MacDonald, Donald)
December 27, 2019 Filing 17 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Response to Motion to Dismiss now due by January 8, 2020. (Lara, Miguel)
December 27, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Jan. 8, 2020 to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Luis A. Orozco.(MacDonald, Donald) Modified on 12/27/2019 to change requested extension date consistent with motion. (Lara, Miguel).
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearing reset for 1/15/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Lara, Miguel)
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(Townsend, Christopher)
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB.(Townsend, Christopher)
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer/responsive pleading to complaint is now due by 12/17/19. (Lara, Miguel)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christopher Charles Townsend. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to December 17, 2019 to File Answer by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB.(Cullen, Sean)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Document received: Proposed Order. (Cullen, Sean)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher Charles Townsend Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8007230 by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cullen, Sean)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT Record. (Lara, Miguel)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.... Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Coppola, Katelyn)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Cullen, Sean)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust. (Cullen, Sean)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7995896 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Cullen, Sean) (Attachment 4 replaced on 12/4/2019) (Lara, Miguel).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orozco v. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Sean B. Cullen
Represented By: Christopher Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Sean B. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez, LLC
Represented By: Sean B. Cullen
Represented By: Christopher Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis A. Orozco
Represented By: Donald J. MacDonald
Represented By: Paul Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?