Tague v. Kennedy
Petitioner: John Tague
Respondent: Steven Kennedy
Case Number: 1:2019cv12490
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 5)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE Petitioner John Tagues (Tague) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 (ECF No. 1) and this action are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2244 (b)(3)(A). See Rule 9 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts (Before presenting a second or successive petition, the petitioner must obtain an order from the appropriate court of appeals authorizing the district court to consider the petition as required by 28 U.S.C. 2244(b)(3) and (4).) Tague previously filed a Section 2254 Petition that was denied on August 6, 2003. See Tague v. Ficco, No. CIV.A. 02-11382-DPW, 2003 WL 21805110 (D. Mass. Aug. 6, 2003). Tague does not have permission from the First Circuit Court of Appeals to bring this second or successive petition. Rather, Tague states in his petition that simultaneously he has moved the First Circuit Court of Appeals for permission to file [this] successive petition. Pet. 1. A review of the First Circuits docket confirms that Tague is seeking authorization from the First Circuit to bring the instant petition. That application is pending. Accordingly, Tagues petition and this action are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 2253(c)(2), this Court denies a certificate of appealability where Tague has failed make a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right.(PSSA, 5)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Petitioner John Tagues (Tague) motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 3) is DENIED. Tague was required to provide a certificate from the warden or other appropriate officer of the place of confinement showing the amount of money or securities that the petitioner has in any account in the institution. Rule 3(a)(2) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Here, the account statement provided by Tague predated the petition filing date by almost two months. The Court is therefore unable to determine whether Tague has the funds to pay the modest $5.00 filing fee.(PSSA, 5)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Tague. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Castilla, Francis)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by John Tague.(Castilla, Francis)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254, filed by John Tague.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tague v. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Tague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?