Khojah v. Moniz
Plaintiff: Yosef Ali Khojah
Defendant: Denis Riordan, Joseph D. McDonald, Jr., Acting Secretary Chad Wolf, District Director Michael J McCleary and Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Case Number: 1:2019cv12508
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Referring Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #13 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
January 27, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Denise J. Casper added. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris no longer assigned to case. (adminn, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 17 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER OF RECUSAL entered.(Lara, Miguel)
January 21, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #13 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Yosef Ali Khojah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bond Transcript, #2 Exhibit Affidavit Susan Church, #3 Exhibit Reinstatement Documents, #4 Exhibit Affidavit Anthony Ellison, #5 Exhibit Bond Exhibits)(Yountz, Heather)
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Petitioner shall file a reply brief on or before 1/21/2020. (Lara, Miguel)
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Antone Moniz re #13 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Record of Correction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl. of Huy M. Le)(Le, Huy)
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B)(Le, Huy)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered re #7 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Respondent's motion for order to show cause (Docket No. #7 ) is therefore DENIED.SO ORDERED. (Lara, Miguel)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered re #9 Motion to Stay. "The motion to stay is denied. The request for an extension until January 10, 2020 is allowed." (Lara, Miguel)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 Opposition re #9 MOTION to Stay Respondent's responsive deadline filed by Yosef Ali Khojah. (Yountz, Heather)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Respondent's responsive deadline by Antone Moniz.(Le, Huy)
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 Supplemental to [ECF No. 7] by Huy Le on behalf of Antone Moniz filed by on behalf of Antone Moniz. (Le, Huy)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as to Why this Case is Related to C.A. No. 19--11314 by Antone Moniz.(Le, Huy)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Huy Le on behalf of Antone Moniz (Le, Huy)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. PCCF Superintendent Antone Moniz shall be substituted as the sole respondent. The Clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of the Petition upon Superintendent Moniz and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. Respondent shall, no later than Friday, January 3, 2020, file a motion for the grant or denial of the Petition and a memorandum in support thereof.To give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Petitioner shall not be moved outside the District of Massachusetts without providing the Court 48 hours' advance notice of the move and the reason therefor. (PSSA, 3)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: STANDING ORDER entered on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Lara, Miguel)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Lara, Miguel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8011901 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Yosef Ali Khojah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Sheet)(Church, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khojah v. Moniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph D. McDonald, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director Michael J McCleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yosef Ali Khojah
Represented By: Heather Yountz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Represented By: Huy Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?