In re: John Good as owner of the F/V Alosa, For Exoneration From Or Limitation Of Liability
Plaintiff: In re: John Good
Case Number: 1:2019cv12514
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brian McEwing. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mary Eliza Reeves. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Simeone, Maria)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mary Elisa Reeves. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian McEwing Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8036579 by In re: John Good. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A; Affidavit of Brian McEwing)(Muzyka, Thomas)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mary Elisa Reeves Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8036548 by In re: John Good. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A; Affidavit of Mary Elisa Reeves)(Muzyka, Thomas)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER APPROVING APPRAISER'S REPORT OF VALUE entered. re #8 Motion for Order to Approve Appraiser's Report (Simeone, Maria)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Order to Approve Appraiser's Report by In re: John Good. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A; Proposed Order Approving Appraisal)(Muzyka, Thomas)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Letter/request (non-motion) from Cover filing for submission of Appraiser's Report pursuant to the Court's Order dated December 17, 2019 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A; Appraiser's Report)(Muzyka, Thomas)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Muzyka on behalf of In re: John Good (Muzyka, Thomas)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Bromley on behalf of In re: John Good (Bromley, John)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (adminn, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Order Appointing Michael Collyer as Appraiser by In re: John Good. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A; CV of Michael Collyer, #2 Exhibit B; Order to Appraise)(Muzyka, Thomas)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8014141 Fee status: Filing Fee paid), filed by In re: John Good. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A; Affidavit of Value)(Muzyka, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: John Good as owner of the F/V Alosa, For Exoneration From Or Limitation Of Liability
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: In re: John Good
Represented By: Thomas J Muzyka
Represented By: Mary Elisa Reeves
Represented By: Brian McEwing
Represented By: John J. Bromley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?