Onoche v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Augustine Onoche
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, As Trustee for Securitized Asset-Backed Recievables LLC 2005-FR5 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-FR5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association and Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv12522
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association.(Swisher, Meredith)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Swisher, Meredith)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part #7 Motion to Continue. Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2020 is RESET for 2/25/2020 02:45 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference to February 14, 2020 by Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Swisher, Meredith)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: ALLOWING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, filed in Suffolk Superior Court (Docket No. 1984CV03640H) Answer deadline extended to January 31, 2020. (Kelly, Danielle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 31, 2020 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, filed in Suffolk Superior Court (Docket No. 1984CV03640H) by Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association.(Swisher, Meredith)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2020 02:45 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, As Trustee for Securitized Asset-Backed Recievables LLC 2005-FR5 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-FR5, Augustine Onoche ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8017524 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit B)(Swisher, Meredith) Modified docket text(Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onoche v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, As Trustee for Securitized Asset-Backed Recievables LLC 2005-FR5 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-FR5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Meredith A. Swisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Meredith A. Swisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augustine Onoche
Represented By: Gregory M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?