Ballerino et al v. RoundPoint Servicing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: John Ballerino, Kathleen T. Gill and Colleen Ballerino
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A. and RoundPoint Servicing Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv12559
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to 2/21/20 to file responsive pleading (Hourihan, Lisa)
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 21, 2020 to Respond to Complaint by RoundPoint Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank, N.A..(Manganaro, Kevin)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (McKillop, Matthew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to file a responsive pleading to 1/24/20 (Hourihan, Lisa)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Warnock, Douglas)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 24, 2020 to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint by RoundPoint Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank, N.A. as Owner Trustee for Carisbrook Asset Holding Trust.(Manganaro, Kevin)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank, N.A. as Owner Trustee for Carisbrook Asset Holding Trust. (Manganaro, Kevin)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RoundPoint Servicing Corporation. (Manganaro, Kevin)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Maura K. McKelvey on behalf of RoundPoint Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank, N.A. as Owner Trustee for Carisbrook Asset Holding Trust (McKelvey, Maura)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RoundPoint Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank, N.A. as Owner Trustee for Carisbrook Asset Holding Trust ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8024551 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - MA Secretary of State printout, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Superior Court Docket, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Sheet)(Manganaro, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballerino et al v. RoundPoint Servicing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Maura K. McKelvey
Represented By: Kevin W. Manganaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RoundPoint Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Maura K. McKelvey
Represented By: Kevin W. Manganaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ballerino
Represented By: James S. Timmins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen T. Gill
Represented By: James S. Timmins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Ballerino
Represented By: James S. Timmins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?