Howe v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: David J. Howe
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for the RMAC Trust Series 2016-CTT, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv12597
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 34 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the forgoing reasons, plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. (Vieira, Leonardo)
February 7, 2020 Filing 33 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #21 Motion for Leave to File Document (Lima, Christine)
February 6, 2020 Filing 32 Reply in Support of Request to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss - Response by David J. Howe to #27 Response, 31 Order on Motion for Leave to File, . (Culik, Joe)
February 6, 2020 Filing 31 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #30 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Vieira, Leonardo)
February 4, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Request to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by David J. Howe. (Attachments: #1 Reply in Support of Request to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss [Proposed])(Culik, Joe)
February 4, 2020 Filing 29 Objection to #27 Response by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williamson, Christopher)
February 3, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by David J. Howe. (Culik, Joe)
February 3, 2020 Filing 27 Response by David J. Howe to #11 MOTION to Dismiss , #25 Response to Motion . (Attachments: #1 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss [Proposed])(Culik, Joe)
January 28, 2020 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #24 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #23 Opposition to Motion. Counsel who filed these documents are requested to submit a courtesy copy of them to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Lima, Christine)
January 28, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Williamson, Christopher)
January 27, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, B, K, F)(Williamson, Christopher)
January 27, 2020 Filing 23 Opposition re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K)(Williamson, Christopher)
January 17, 2020 Filing 22 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered denying #18 Motion to Expedite. "Motion Denied" (McDonagh, Christina)
January 16, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to Motion for Expedited Decision by David J. Howe.(Culik, Josef)
January 16, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Expedite Decision on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Moore, Ryan)
January 16, 2020 Filing 19 Opposition re #18 MOTION to Expedite Decision on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Moore, Ryan)
January 15, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Expedite Decision on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by David J. Howe.(Culik, Josef)
January 13, 2020 Filing 17 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered: ALLOWING #16 Joint MOTION Set Briefing Schedule. (Vieira, Leonardo)
January 8, 2020 Filing 16 Joint MOTION Set Briefing Schedule re #11 MOTION to Dismiss , #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by David J. Howe.(Culik, Josef)
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 STATE COURT Record. (Moore, Ryan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #11 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 Affidavit in Support, #13 Request for Judicial Notice, #10 Declaration, #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #9 Affidavit in Support, #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion. Counsel who filed these documents are requested to submit a courtesy copy of them to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Lima, Christine)
January 2, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Judicial Notice by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6)(Williamson, Christopher)
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(Williamson, Christopher)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association.(Williamson, Christopher)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Declaration of Josef Culik) by David J. Howe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Response to Demand Letter), #2 Exhibit 2 (Expert Report))(Culik, Josef)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Culik, Josef)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Verified Complaint). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Culik, Josef)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by David J. Howe. (Culik, Josef)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by David J. Howe.(Culik, Josef)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bankcorp for U.S. Bank National Association.. (Moore, Ryan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Roosevelt Management Company, LLC for Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC.. (Moore, Ryan)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for the RMAC Trust Series 2016-CTT ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8030164 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplement Category Form)(Moore, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howe v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for the RMAC Trust Series 2016-CTT
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Christopher J. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Christopher J. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Howe
Represented By: Joe Dye Culik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?