SUBPOENA SERVED ON UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT et al
Petitioner: ARCO INGENIEROS S.A. de C.V.
In Re: SUBPOENA SERVED ON UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Case Number: 1:2019mc91230
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Referring Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Considering #15 Withdrawal, ELECTRONIC ORDER entered withdrawing without prejudice #1 Motion to Compel. (Putnam, Harold)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 Withdrawal of motion: 14 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #1 filed by ARCO INGENIEROS S.A. de C.V... (Mirenda, Anthony)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #1 : Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2019 12:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (Putnam, Harold)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 15, 2019 to File Response/Reply to Motion to Compel by SUBPOENA SERVED ON UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT.(Goldstein, Rachel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #1 : Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
June 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (Bowler, Marianne)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. Motions referred: #1 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Subpoena, #8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 14, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #1 . (Lara, Miguel) Motions referred to Marianne B. Bowler.
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Mirenda on behalf of ARCO INGENIEROS S.A. de C.V. (Mirenda, Anthony)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 14, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #1 by SUBPOENA SERVED ON UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT.(Goldstein, Rachel)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Goldstein on behalf of SUBPOENA SERVED ON UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT (Goldstein, Rachel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-mc-00065.
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Transfer Case. This matter shall be transferred forthwith to the District Court of Massachusetts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 05/16/2019. (lcrm1)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the United States Agency for International Development's (USAID) pending #3 Motion to Transfer Case, which includes an unopposed request to extend the deadline for USAID to respond to Petitioner Arco Ingenieros's #1 Motion to Compel, the Court finds good cause to extend the deadline. Accordingly, USAID shall respond to the pending Motion to Compel on or before May 28, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 05/16/2019. (lcrm1)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case by SUBPOENA SERVED ON UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT (Clark, Denise)
May 9, 2019 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather for #1 Motion to Compel. (zad)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. It is ORDERED that this matter is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge for determination pursuant to LCvR 72.2(a). Henceforth, and until this referral is terminated, all filings related to this case shall include the initials of the magistrate judge, once assigned by the Clerk of the Court, in the caption next to the initials of the undersigned judge. See LCvR 5.1(f). See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/9/2019. (lcabj2)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Subpoena ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 4616097880.) filed by ARCO INGENIEROS, S.A. DE C.V.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(jf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUBPOENA SERVED ON UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: SUBPOENA SERVED ON UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Rachel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ARCO INGENIEROS S.A. de C.V.
Represented By: John Peter Marston
Represented By: Anthony Mirenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?