Siri v. White
Plaintiff: Ginger Siri
Defendant: Thomas C. White
Case Number: 1:2020cv10023
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Attachments: #1 Template for Scheduling Order)(Bono, Christine)
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Thomas C. White.(Minich, Bethany)
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 STATE COURT Record. (Minich, Bethany)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered denying #5 Motion to Remand (Halley, Taylor)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447 by Ginger Siri.(Halley, Taylor)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Currie, Haley)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany Pierson Minich on behalf of Thomas C. White (Minich, Bethany)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Thomas C. White ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8043039 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form)(Minich, Bethany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siri v. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C. White
Represented By: Bethany Pierson Minich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger Siri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?