Marino v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Robert Marino
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv10048
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John R. Fabry. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jose Luis Munoz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John R. Fabry Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8083562 by Robert Marino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Straus, Alex)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jose Luis Munoz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8083218 by Robert Marino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Munoz PHV Motion, #2 Exhibit B_Munoz PHV App.)(Straus, Alex)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Marino. Ford Motor Company waiver sent on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Straus, Alex)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 4/13/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
January 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
January 13, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8049584 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Robert Marino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Summons to Ford Motor Company)(Straus, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marino v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Marino
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?