Basile v. Tompkins et al
Plaintiff: Salvatore Basile
Defendant: Naphcare, Inc., Arun Chaudhary, Yolanda Smith and Sheriff Steven Thompkins
Case Number: 1:2020cv10096
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Pro Bono Attorney Appearance by Pavel Bespalko on behalf of Salvatore Basile (Bespalko, Pavel)
March 12, 2020 Filing 25 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel. There being sufficient cause to exercise the discretionary power of the Court to appoint counsel, it is ORDERED that Pavel Y. Bespalko, Esq. is appointed to represent the plaintiff under the provisions of the United States District Court Plan for the Appointment of Counsel For Indigent Parties in Certain Civil Cases. Appointed counsel or his designated associate(s) shall serve until the litigation is terminated or the Court enters an order revoking said appointment.(PSSA, 3)
March 12, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Yolanda Smith, Steven Tompkins.(Garand, Melissa). Modified on 3/13/2020: Replaced document to remove blank pages. (Kelly, Danielle).
March 12, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Seal Document #22 Opposition to Motion Exhibit 1, Affidavit of Dr. Chaudhary by Yolanda Smith, Steven Tompkins.(Garand, Melissa)
March 12, 2020 Filing 22 Opposition re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Yolanda Smith, Steven Tompkins. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Affidavit)(Garand, Melissa)
March 5, 2020 Filing 21 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Naphcare, Inc. (Kelly, Danielle)
March 5, 2020 Filing 20 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Arun Chaudhary. (Kelly, Danielle)
February 26, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM Of Law in Support re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Salvatore Basile. (Kelly, Danielle)
February 26, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Salvatore Basile. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Kelly, Danielle)
February 24, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Yolanda Smith, Steven Tompkins.(Garand, Melissa)
February 19, 2020 Filing 14 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: DENYING Defendants Sheriff Steven Tompkins and Superintendent Yolanda Smith's Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Plaintiffs Complaint #12 . Defendants acknowledge that they were served on February 14, 2020. Accordingly, their response is due March 6, 2020, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a), not March 16, 2020, as set forth in the motion. Moreover, in light of the complaint's allegations that Plaintiff is detained pre-trial and is suffering ongoing harm, the Defendants' generalized need for "additional time to evaluate the Plaintiffs medical records, and assess the allegations" is insufficient cause to support the requested extension of time. (Kelly, Danielle)
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: ALLOWING Defendants Sheriff Steven Tompkins and Superintendent Yolanda Smith's Motion to Waive Local Rule 7.1(a)(2) #11 . (Kelly, Danielle)
February 18, 2020 Filing 16 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Summons. Steven Tompkins Served on 2/14/2020. (Kelly, Danielle)
February 18, 2020 Filing 15 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Summons. Yolanda Smith Served on 2/14/2020. (Kelly, Danielle)
February 18, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 15, 2020 to Answer the Complaint by Yolanda Smith, Steven Thompkins.(Garand, Melissa)
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION To Waive Local Rule 7.1(a)(2) by Yolanda Smith, Steven Thompkins.(Garand, Melissa)
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa J. Garand on behalf of Yolanda Smith, Steven Thompkins (Garand, Melissa)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE: re payment of fee (prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at Suffolk County House of Correction (PSSA, 3)
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Upon review of the plaintiff's institutional account statement, the Court assesses an initial partial filing of $184.43. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The remainder of the filing fee, $165.57, shall be collected in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The Clerk shall provide a copy of this order to the treasurer of the institution having custody of the plaintiff.(PSSA, 3) Modified on 2/7/2020 (PSSA, 3).
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Salvatore Basile. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(Kelly, Danielle)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Salvatore Basile. (Kelly, Danielle)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. Plaintiff should complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. (Attachments: #1 Instructions for Service and Local Rule 4.1)(PSSA, 3)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered conditionally granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must provide a six-month prison account statement. Summonses shall issue. (PSSA, 3) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/17/2020) (PSSA, 3).
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Salvatore Basile.(Castilla, Francis)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Salvatore Basile. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basile v. Tompkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore Basile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naphcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arun Chaudhary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Steven Thompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?