Marshall v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Melissa Marshall
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv10166
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7426
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Melissa Marshall. Melissa Marshall served on 2/7/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. (Markham, John)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
January 28, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Seeking a Declaratory Judgment, Injunctive Relief and Damages for Wrongful Levy on Property of the Plaintiff against United States of America Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8074973 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Melissa Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Form)(Markham, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Marshall
Represented By: John J.E. Markham, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?