Langford v. Kingfisher Bait Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Neil Langford and The Channel Syndicate 2015
Defendant: F/V UGLY DUCK (O.N. 985630) and Kingfisher Bait Company, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Rose's Oil Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10221
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 14 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for F/V UGLY DUCK (O.N 985630) her engines, tackle, gear and appurtenances. "Agreement has been reached and arrest is no longer needed" 3/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Similar) (McDonagh, Christina)
March 31, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Bromley on behalf of The Channel Syndicate 2015 (Bromley, John)
March 31, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Neil Langford, The Channel Syndicate 2015.(Muzyka, Thomas)
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock:ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time for the In Personam and In Rem Claimant Defendant to File its Responsive Pleading until 4/23/2020. (Beatty, Barbara)
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 23, 2020 to File Answer by Neil Langford.(Muzyka, Thomas)
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 In Rem Warrant Of Arrest of F/V Ugly Duck (O.N. 985630) (Vieira, Leonardo)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Custodian Substitute Custodian by Neil Langford. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Muzyka, Thomas)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Bromley on behalf of Neil Langford (Bromley, John)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Admiralty and Prayer for In Rem Arrest against F/V UGLY DUCK (O.N. 985630), Kingfisher Bait Company, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8090472 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Neil Langford. (Attachments: #1 Local Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muzyka, Thomas) Modified on 2/5/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langford v. Kingfisher Bait Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V UGLY DUCK (O.N. 985630)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingfisher Bait Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Langford
Represented By: Thomas J Muzyka
Represented By: John J. Bromley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Channel Syndicate 2015
Represented By: Thomas J Muzyka
Represented By: John J. Bromley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Rose's Oil Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?