Perino et al v. Zwicker and Associates, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Alexandra Perino and Susan Leitao
Defendant: Massachusetts Educational Financing Authority and Zwicker and Associates, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10237
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling 16.b scheduling conference set for 4/13/20. Parties shall file the Joint Statement on or before 4/7/20, court will review and make a ruling on the papers. Due to the General Order 20-2 in re: COVID-19 Public Emergency the 16.b is canceled and no hearing is necessary at this time. (Molloy, Maryellen)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel H. Newburger on behalf of Zwicker and Associates, P.C. (Newburger, Manuel)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION Conduct Scheduling Conference Telephonically submitted by Massachusetts Educational Financing Authority, Zwicker and Associates, P.C..(Zwicker, Bryan)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.... Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zwicker and Associates, P.C.. (Zwicker, Bryan)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Massachusetts Educational Financing Authority. (Zwicker, Bryan)
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Massachusetts Educational Financing Authority, Zwicker and Associates, P.C..(Zwicker, Bryan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Massachusetts Educational Financing Authority, Zwicker and Associates, P.C.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet Category Sheet by Susan Leitao, Alexandra Perino. (Thurbide, Kristin)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8095274 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Susan Leitao, Alexandra Perino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Thurbide, Kristin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perino et al v. Zwicker and Associates, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Perino
Represented By: Kristin L. Thurbide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Leitao
Represented By: Kristin L. Thurbide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Educational Financing Authority
Represented By: Bryan David Zwicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zwicker and Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Bryan David Zwicker
Represented By: Manuel H. Newburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?