Green v. D2L LTD et al
Plaintiff: Susan Green
Defendant: D2L Ltd and John Baker
Case Number: 1:2020cv10241
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: ALLOWING #11 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants D2L Ltd and John Baker answers due April 25, 2020. (Kelly, Danielle)
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 25, 2020 to File Answer at the Same Time as Defendant Baker by D2L Ltd.(Mooney, Molly)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Baker. (LaPorte, Thomas) Modified on 3/3/2020, to correct docket entry text (MacDonald, Gail).
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mooney, Molly)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer D2L Ltd answer/response due 3/6/2020. (MacDonald, Gail)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 6, 2020 to File Answer by D2L Ltd.(Mooney, Molly)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Kelly, Danielle)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel D. Cudkowicz on behalf of D2L Ltd (Cudkowicz, Ariel)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by D2L Ltd identifying Corporate Parent D2L Corporation for D2L Ltd.. (Mooney, Molly)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Clayton Mooney on behalf of D2L Ltd (Mooney, Molly)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by D2L LTD ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8096152 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Mooney, Molly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. D2L LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D2L Ltd
Represented By: Molly Clayton Mooney
Represented By: Ariel D. Cudkowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Green
Represented By: Thomas C. LaPorte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?