Leonardo v. International Business Machines Corporation
Plaintiff: Anthony Leonardo
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv10245
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. 30 DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Halley, Taylor)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2020 03:10 PM in Courtroom 10 before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Attachments: #1 Template for Scheduling Order)(Bono, Christine)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 State Court Record by International Business Machines Corporation ( Fee Status: IFP granted) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pickett, Andrew) Modified on 3/18/2020 to correct docket text. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia).
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by International Business Machines Corporation.(McAllister, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer International Business Machines Corporation answer due 2/24/2020. (Bono, Christine)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Pickett on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation (Pickett, Andrew)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 24, 2020 to File Answer by International Business Machines Corporation.(McAllister, Jeffrey)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by International Business Machines Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8096753 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McAllister, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonardo v. International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey S. McAllister
Represented By: Andrew C. Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Leonardo
Represented By: Craig D. Levey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?