Londo v. King's Creek Plantation, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: David Londo
Defendant: King's Creek Plantation, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10312
Filed: February 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer King's Creek Plantation, L.L.C. answer due 4/20/2020. (Lara, Miguel)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 20, 2020 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by King's Creek Plantation, L.L.C..(Goldberg, Howard)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Marissa L. Morte on behalf of King's Creek Plantation, L.L.C. (Morte, Marissa)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard P Goldberg on behalf of King's Creek Plantation, L.L.C. (Goldberg, Howard)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed King's Creek Plantation, L.L.C. served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Paronich, Anthony)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to King's Creek Plantation, L.L.C.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
February 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex M. Washkowitz on behalf of David Londo (Washkowitz, Alex)
February 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against King's Creek Plantation, L.L.C. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8110727 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by David Londo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Civil Category Form)(Paronich, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Londo v. King's Creek Plantation, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Londo
Represented By: Anthony I. Paronich
Represented By: Alex M. Washkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King's Creek Plantation, L.L.C.
Represented By: Marissa L. Morte
Represented By: Howard P Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?