HYBIR, INC. v. VEEAM SOFTWARE CORPORATION
Plaintiff: HYBIR, INC.
Defendant: VEEAM SOFTWARE CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv10329
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: M Page Kelley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Daniel S. Block.; granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Byron L. Pickard.; granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Robert E. Niemeier. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Belmont, Kellyann)
March 10, 2020 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Unopposed Motion to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file an answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint, on or before the close of business on May 11, 2020. (MacDougall, Patricia)
March 9, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert E. Niemeier Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8146825 by VEEAM SOFTWARE CORPORATION.(Kaviar, Eric)
March 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Byron L. Pickard Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8146823 by VEEAM SOFTWARE CORPORATION.(Kaviar, Eric)
March 9, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daniel S. Block Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8146821 by VEEAM SOFTWARE CORPORATION.(Kaviar, Eric)
March 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Shepard Davidson on behalf of VEEAM SOFTWARE CORPORATION (Davidson, Shepard)
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G.J. Kaviar on behalf of VEEAM SOFTWARE CORPORATION (Kaviar, Eric)
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by VEEAM SOFTWARE CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent VS Holding I Inc. for VEEAM SOFTWARE CORPORATION.. (Kaviar, Eric)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to May 11, 2020 to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint - UNOPPOSED by VEEAM SOFTWARE CORPORATION.(Kaviar, Eric)
March 5, 2020 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund, for $100.00 paid on 03/04/2020, receipt number 0101-8139576. (Tran, Henry)
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sarah A. Pfeiffer. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Belmont, Kellyann)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sarah A. Pfeiffer Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8139643 by HYBIR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Sarah A. Pfeiffer)(Ostrow, Seth)
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Service of Process filed by HYBIR, INC.. Individual(s)/Entities served: VEEAM SOFTWARE CORPORATION. (Ostrow, Seth)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to VEEAM SOFTWARE CORPORATION. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HYBIR, INC.. (Ostrow, Seth)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Ostrow, Seth)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VEEAM SOFTWARE CORPORATION Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8114891 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by HYBIR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Category Form)(Ostrow, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HYBIR, INC. v. VEEAM SOFTWARE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HYBIR, INC.
Represented By: Seth H. Ostrow
Represented By: Sarah A. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VEEAM SOFTWARE CORPORATION
Represented By: Eric G.J. Kaviar
Represented By: Robert E. Niemeier
Represented By: Daniel S. Block
Represented By: Shepard Davidson
Represented By: Byron L. Pickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?