ecobee, Inc. v. Pro Click et al
Plaintiff: ecobee, Inc.
Defendant: Pro Click, Green Good Deals, Budrug Sales LLC and Stelli Products
Case Number: 1:2020cv10332
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 14 Electronic notice to counsel: This civil action has been transferred to the Eastern District of New York and assigned civil case number 1:20-cv-01554. (Danieli, Chris)
March 26, 2020 Filing 13 Case transferred to the Eastern District of New York. Case file electronically sent to the Clerk in that district. (Pacho, Arnold)
March 26, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #11 Stipulation to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Treated as a motion and allowed. (Pacho, Arnold)
March 25, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION To Transfer to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York by Budrug Sales LLC, Pro Click, Stelli Products. (Lent, Jonathan)
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ecobee, Inc..(Nickerson, Morgan)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time until 3/27/2020 to respond to Complaint. (Tang, Danni)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 27, 2020 to Respond to the Complaint Unopposed by Budrug Sales LLC, Pro Click, Stelli Products.(Lent, Jonathan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by ecobee, Inc.. Budrug Sales LLC served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020; Green Good Deals served on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020; Pro Click served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020; Stelli Products served on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020. Acknowledgement filed by ecobee, Inc.. (Nickerson, Morgan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Alternative service. (Zierk, Marsha)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION For Alternative Service by ecobee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Ruling, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Ruling, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Ruling)(Nickerson, Morgan)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Burgos, Sandra)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8115244 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by ecobee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Form AO120)(Nickerson, Morgan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ecobee, Inc. v. Pro Click et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Click
Represented By: Jonathan W. Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Good Deals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budrug Sales LLC
Represented By: Jonathan W. Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stelli Products
Represented By: Jonathan W. Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ecobee, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan T. Nickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?