Klavdianos et al v. U.S. Bank, National Association
Plaintiff: Maria Klavdianos and Spiros Karras
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association as Legal Title Trustee 2016 SC6 Title Trust and U.S. Bank, National Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv10377
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 11 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Initial disclosures by 3/31/2020; amended pleadings may be filed after 6/15/2020; fact discovery to be completed by 8/31/2020; dispositive motions due by 10/31/2020. A Status Conference is set for 9/2/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 19, 2020 Filing 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Court has reviewed the #9 proposed schedule and finds it reasonable, accordingly it is ADOPTED. The Court hereby CANCELS the Rule 16 conference. Either party may request a telephone status or telephone Rule 16 conference by filing a motion or contacting the clerk. The Court will hold a status conference on 9/2/2020 at 2:30 PM. Counsel shall appear at this conference by telephone. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Local Rule 16.1 Joint Statement and Proposed Pretrial Schedule. (Polansky, Kevin)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE; Counsel wishing to appear shall do so by phone by calling into the courts conference line at 888-675-2535 access code 9123576. re #6 Notice of Scheduling Conference (Simeone, Maria)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, Summons, Tracking Order, #2 correspondence, #3 Notice of Removal)(Polansky, Kevin)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference; A Scheduling Conference has been set for 3/25/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling order sample, #2 standing order on summary judgment)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Bank, National Association.(Polansky, Kevin)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Coppola, Katelyn)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank, National Association as Legal Title Trustee 2016 SC6 Title Trust. (Polansky, Kevin)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Bank, National Association as Legal Title Trustee 2016 SC6 Title Trust ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8123323 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A/Complaint, #2 Exhibit B/State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C/Mortgage, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form)(Polansky, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klavdianos et al v. U.S. Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association as Legal Title Trustee 2016 SC6 Title Trust
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Klavdianos
Represented By: Ara J. Balikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spiros Karras
Represented By: Ara J. Balikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?