Massachusetts Property Insurance Underwriting Association v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Property Insurance Underwriting Association
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10383
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 13 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery to be completed by 4/30/2021; Motions for summary judgment due by 8/31/2021; Ready for Trial on 11/1/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.(Gaudet, Jennifer)
April 13, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. i>In light of the recent developments with the COVID-19 pandemic, the scheduling conference set for April 13, 2020 at 3:00 PM is canceled. A case management scheduling order will issue. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
April 10, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 with cert. of service by Massachusetts Property Insurance Underwriting Association.(Corson, Brett)
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Schwindt on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Schwindt, Jordan)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Pickett, Rene)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(Pickett, Rene)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 STATE COURT Record Electrolux Home Products, Inc. summons served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020.. (Pickett, Rene)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan F. Tabasky on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Tabasky, Jonathan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett R. Corson on behalf of Massachusetts Property Insurance Underwriting Association (Corson, Brett)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Coppola, Katelyn)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8125156 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Pickett, Rene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massachusetts Property Insurance Underwriting Association v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Property Insurance Underwriting Association
Represented By: Michael P Guagenty
Represented By: Brett R. Corson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Rene M. Pickett
Represented By: Jordan L. Schwindt
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?