Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC v. Adams
Petitioner: Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC
Respondent: Mark A Adams, Sr.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10385
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference reset for 6/4/2020 11:30 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Belpedio, Lisa)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion to Continue. (Bowler, Marianne)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC.(Wood, Charles)
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Wood in Support of Request for Entry of Default)(Wood, Charles)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 4/27/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC. Mark A Adams, Sr served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC. (Wood, Charles)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mark A Adams, Sr. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Confirm Arbitration Award against Mark A Adams, Sr Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8125610 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Submission Agreement, #2 Exhibit Arbitration Award, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Wood, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark A Adams, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Charles A. Wood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?