Kyricopoulos v. Mendoza et al
Petitioner: James Peter Kyricopoulos
Respondent: Maura Healey and Marta Mendoza
Case Number: 1:2020cv10393
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to May 19, 2020 to File Answer or Responsive Pleading. (Kelly, Danielle)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to May 19, 2020 to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Maura Healey, Marta Mendoza.(Blume, Todd)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd M. Blume on behalf of Maura Healey, Marta Mendoza (Blume, Todd)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 21 days of receipt of this order. (York, Steve) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/28/2020) (York, Steve).
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 Copy re 4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge mailed to James Peter Kyricopoulos (MacDonald, Gail)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Referred for: Full Pretrial, Dispositive Motions (ptd). (MacDonald, Gail)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 Filing fee/payment: $5.00, receipt number 1BST079017 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Coppola, Katelyn)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by James Peter Kyricopoulos. (Castilla, Francis)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254, filed by James Peter Kyricopoulos.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyricopoulos v. Mendoza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Maura Healey
Represented By: Todd M. Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marta Mendoza
Represented By: Todd M. Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Peter Kyricopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?