WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, as successor indenture trustee for the 6.875% Senior Notes due 2019, the 8.25% Senior Notes due 2019, and the 6.125% Senior Notes due 2034 of Nine v. Card et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB
Defendant: Geode Diversified Fund, JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC, DWS Small Cap Index VIP, Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund, Boston Partners All-Cap Value Fund, Longfellow Investment Management Co., LLC, Boston Partners Asset Management, LLC, Rhumbline Advisers LP, Wesley R Card, John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund a/k/a John Hancock II SEA Small Cap, Manulife Investment Management (North America) Ltd., Boston Partners, LLC, John Hancock Variable Insurance Trust SEA Small Cap, GDF, PanAgora Asset Management Inc, Lincoln Institute of Land Policy, Arbor Place Ltd. Partnership and Ann Marie C Wilkins
Case Number: 1:2020cv10398
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Klebanoff on behalf of Arbor Place Ltd. Partnership (Klebanoff, David)
April 16, 2020 Filing 52 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #51 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Arbor Place Ltd. Partnership. Answer due 5/18/2020. (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 15, 2020 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 18, 2020 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Defendant Arbor Place Ltd. Partnership, Nunc Pro Tunc, by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB.(Koha, David)
April 9, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of filing a notice of appearance and corporate disclosure statement by Attorney Edward Freidman with JPML by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-10286-NMG, 1:20-cv-10288-NMG, 1:20-cv-10396-NMG, 1:20-cv-10398-NMG(Jones, Sherry)
April 9, 2020 Filing 49 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #48 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC answer due 5/18/2020; Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund answer due 5/18/2020; DWS Small Cap Index VIP answer due 5/18/2020; Geode Diversified Fund answer due 5/18/2020. (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 8, 2020 Filing 48 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 18, 2020 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB.(Koha, David)
April 3, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Devore on behalf of Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC, Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund, DWS Small Cap Index VIP, Geode Diversified Fund (Devore, Andrew)
April 2, 2020 Filing 46 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #45 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Lincoln Institute of Land Policy. Answer due 5/18/2020. (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 1, 2020 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 18, 2020 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Lincoln Institute of Land Policy, by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB.(Koha, David)
April 1, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB of Plaintiff's Motion Filed with United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation for Transfer of Actions to the District of Massachusetts Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Motion for Transfer of Actions to the District of Massachusetts, #2 Exhibit Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Transfer, #3 Exhibit Schedule of Actions, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Priyanka Wityk in Support of Motion for Transfer, #5 Exhibit Docket sheets and complaints in the Actions, #6 Exhibit Proof of Service of Plaintiffs' Motion for Transfer)(Morrier, John)
April 1, 2020 Filing 43 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Rhumbline Advisers LP. Answer due 5/18/2020. (Vieira, Leonardo)
March 31, 2020 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 18, 2020 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Rhumbline Advisers LP, by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB.(Koha, David)
March 31, 2020 Filing 41 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff and Defendant PanAgora Asset Management Inc. without Prejudice by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. (Morrier, John)
March 30, 2020 Filing 40 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust answer due 5/18/2020; John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund a/k/a John Hancock II SEA Small Cap answer due 5/18/2020; Manulife Investment Management (North America) Ltd. answer due 5/18/2020. (Vieira, Leonardo)
March 27, 2020 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed DWS Small Cap Index VIP served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/17/2020. (Koha, David)
March 27, 2020 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/17/2020. (Koha, David)
March 27, 2020 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/17/2020. (Koha, David)
March 27, 2020 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 18, 2020 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB.(Koha, David)
March 27, 2020 Filing 35 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Wesley R Card. Answer due 5/18/2020.; ALLOWING #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Wesley R Card. Answer due 5/18/2020. (Vieira, Leonardo)
March 27, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Mangones on behalf of Rhumbline Advisers LP (Mangones, John)
March 26, 2020 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 18, 2020 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, against Longfellow Investment Management Co., LLC, by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB.(Koha, David)
March 26, 2020 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 18, 2020 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Wesley R. Card, by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB.(Koha, David)
March 24, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed Rhumbline Advisers LP served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Bednarz, Michael)
March 24, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed PanAgora Asset Management Inc served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Bednarz, Michael)
March 24, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed Manulife Investment Management (North America) Ltd. served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Bednarz, Michael)
March 24, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed Longfellow Investment Management Co., LLC served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Bednarz, Michael)
March 24, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed Lincoln Institute of Land Policy served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Bednarz, Michael)
March 24, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund a/k/a John Hancock II SEA Small Cap served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Bednarz, Michael)
March 24, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Bednarz, Michael)
March 24, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed Geode Diversified Fund served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Bednarz, Michael)
March 24, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed Boston Partners, LLC served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Bednarz, Michael)
March 24, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed Boston Partners Asset Management, LLC served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Bednarz, Michael)
March 24, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed Boston Partners All-Cap Value Fund served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Bednarz, Michael)
March 24, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed Arbor Place Ltd. Partnership served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Bednarz, Michael)
March 24, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ann Marie C Wilkins served on 3/11/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Bednarz, Michael)
March 24, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed Wesley R Card served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. (Bednarz, Michael)
March 20, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Docket entry #15 modified to correct event type. Counsel is reminded to review the local rules and the CM/ECF administrative procedures when filing documents with the Court. A list of events is available on the CM/ECF Training Information page of the courts website. (Vieira, Leonardo)
March 20, 2020 Filing 16 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Ann Marie C Wilkins. Answer due 5/18/2020. (Vieira, Leonardo)
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION Motion and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. (Koha, David) Modified on 3/20/2020 to fix docket text and event type (Vieira, Leonardo).
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Carroll on behalf of Ann Marie C Wilkins (Carroll, James)
March 18, 2020 Filing 13 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered: ALLOWING #8 Motion to Appoint Special Process Server. (Vieira, Leonardo)
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Robert J. Lack. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; ALLOWING #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Edward A. Friedman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
March 3, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: : In the future all exhibits should be separated and filed as separate attachments. Counsel is reminded to review the local rules and the attorney handbook when filing documents with the Court by accessing our web page, at www.mad.uscourts.gov under CM/ECF E-Filing. (Vieira, Leonardo)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Edward A. Friedman, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8134281 by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB.(Fencer, Michael) (Main Document 10 replaced on 3/3/2020) (Vieira, Leonardo). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2020: #1 Certification) (Vieira, Leonardo).
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert J. Lack, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8134220 by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB.(Fencer, Michael) (Main Document 9 replaced on 3/3/2020) (Vieira, Leonardo). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2020: #1 Certification) (Vieira, Leonardo).
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Special Process Server (Expedited Determination Without Hearing Requested) by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB.(Koha, David)
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Weyland, Loren)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Complaint, by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. (Fencer, Michael)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Morrier on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB (Morrier, John)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Bednarz on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB (Bednarz, Michael)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David Koha on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB (Koha, David)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8130148 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, as successor indenture trustee for the 6.875% Senior Notes due 2019, the 8.25% Senior Notes due 2019, and the 6.125% Senior Notes due 2034 of Nine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fencer, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, as successor indenture trustee for the 6.875% Senior Notes due 2019, the 8.25% Senior Notes due 2019, and the 6.125% Senior Notes due 2034 of Nine v. Card et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geode Diversified Fund
Represented By: Andrew G. Devore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC
Represented By: Andrew G. Devore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DWS Small Cap Index VIP
Represented By: Andrew G. Devore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund
Represented By: Andrew G. Devore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Partners All-Cap Value Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longfellow Investment Management Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Partners Asset Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhumbline Advisers LP
Represented By: John A. Mangones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley R Card
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund a/k/a John Hancock II SEA Small Cap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manulife Investment Management (North America) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hancock Variable Insurance Trust SEA Small Cap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GDF
Represented By: Andrew G. Devore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PanAgora Asset Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Institute of Land Policy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arbor Place Ltd. Partnership
Represented By: David L. Klebanoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Marie C Wilkins
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB
Represented By: Michael J. Fencer
Represented By: John T. Morrier
Represented By: David Koha
Represented By: Michael A. Bednarz
Represented By: Robert J. Lack
Represented By: Edward A Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?