Merola v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Steven Merola
Defendant: Lucien Gougeon, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust 2006-NC1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-NC1 and Rico Realty Trust
Case Number: 1:2020cv10418
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 08:1324
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM is ALLOWED. Plaintiff has until May 25, 2020 to respond to the Motion to Dismiss and the Court finds the Order to Show Cause satisfied. If Plaintiff wishes to seek dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 41(a)(A)(1), he shall file a notice of dismissal under that provision. Absent the application of Rule 41(a)(1)(B), such a dismissal is ordinarily without prejudice. Responses due by 5/25/2020 (Montes, Mariliz)
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/25/2020 to File Response to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Steven Merola.(Montes, Mariliz)
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSEThe Court now ORDERS Plaintiff Merola to file an opposition or motion to continue by no later than April 24, 2020. Should Plaintiff fail to file such a response, he faces dismissal of his complaint due to failure to prosecute and failure to obey this Court Order, and allowance of Defendants' motion to dismiss as unopposed.A copy of this Order has been mailed to the Plaintiff.( Show Cause Response due by 4/24/2020.), Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM .( Responses due by 4/24/2020)(Montes, Mariliz)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (Mikolinski, Edward)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust 2006-NC1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-NC1, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B - Deed, #3 Exhibit C - Trust Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Secured Claim, #5 Exhibit E - Letter of Intent, #6 Exhibit F - TRO Motion, #7 Exhibit G - State Court Docket, #8 Exhibit H - Bankruptcy Case Docket, #9 Exhibit I - Prior Action Docket)(Mikolinski, Edward)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust 2006-NC1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-NC1, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Mikolinski, Edward)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Currie, Haley)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward James Mikolinski on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust 2006-NC1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-NC1, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Mikolinski, Edward)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust 2006-NC1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-NC1 identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust 2006-NC1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-NC1.. (Fialkow, David)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Fialkow, David)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust 2006-NC1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-NC1, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8135298 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Injunction Motion, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Prior Action Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit E - Mortgage, #6 Exhibit F - Deed, #7 Exhibit G - Trust Declaration, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Category Form)(Fialkow, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merola v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucien Gougeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Edward James Mikolinski
Represented By: David E. Fialkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust 2006-NC1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-NC1
Represented By: Edward James Mikolinski
Represented By: David E. Fialkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rico Realty Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Merola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?