Liberty Roofing Company v. The Haskell Company, et al
Plaintiff: United State of America
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America and The Haskell Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv10419
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Folan, Karen)
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company, The Haskell Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Connelly, John)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to April 30, 2020 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company answer due 4/30/2020; The Haskell Company answer due 4/30/2020; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America answer due 4/30/2020. (McDonagh, Christina)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration (McDonagh, Christina)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to April 30, 2020 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company, The Haskell Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Connelly, John)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company, The Haskell Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Connelly, John)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8135672 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Liberty Roofing Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Lederman, Maury) Modified Category Form name on 3/3/2020 (Warnock, Douglas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Roofing Company v. The Haskell Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United State of America
Represented By: Maury E. Lederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: John P. Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: John P. Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Haskell Company
Represented By: John P. Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?