Massachusetts Board of Bar Overseers v. Belanger
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Board of Bar Overseers
Defendant: Lisa Siegel Belanger
Case Number: 1:2020cv10445
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 11 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND.(Kelly, Danielle)
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 Case file sent to Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Belanger's Motion to Quash #6 is DENIED and the BBO's Motion to Remand #5 is GRANTED. The clerk shall promptly mail a certified copy of this order of remand to the Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Kelly, Danielle)
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 Opposition re #6 MOTION to Quash WITH PREJUDICE filed by Massachusetts Board of Bar Overseers. (Hass, Merle)
March 25, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 by Merle R. Hass on behalf of Massachusetts Board of Bar Overseers filed by on behalf of Massachusetts Board of Bar Overseers. (Hass, Merle)
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Quash WITH PREJUDICE by Lisa Siegel Belanger. (Attachments: #1 Appendix copy of unpublished case, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Emails re 3.23.2020, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 copy of certification of removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Bar Counsel SJC filing, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 BD-2020-0013 docket, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Emails re 3.20.2020)(Belanger, Lisa)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Massachusetts Board of Bar Overseers.(Hass, Merle)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McKillop, Matthew)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Case not directly assigned to DJ Burroughs as being related to 15-10198-ADB, due to 15-10198 was closed on 4/25/2017 - over two (2) years ago. (Finn, Mary)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee/payment: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8140795 (DaSilva, Carolina)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lisa Siegel Belanger Belanger.(Belanger, Lisa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibits Part 1) (McKillop, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2020: #5 Exhibits Part 2, #6 Exhibits Part 3, #7 Exhibits Part 4, #8 Exhibits Part 5, #9 Exhibits Part 6, #10 Exhibits Part 7, #11 Exhibits Part 8) (McKillop, Matthew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massachusetts Board of Bar Overseers v. Belanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Siegel Belanger
Represented By: Lisa S. Belanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Board of Bar Overseers
Represented By: Joseph S. Berman
Represented By: Merle R. Hass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?