Burke Plumbing & Heating, Inc. v. Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Plaintiff: Burke Plumbing & Heating, Inc.
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv10477
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 Opposition re #12 MOTION for Leave to File Reply filed by Burke Plumbing & Heating, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply)(Rodrigues, Jordan)
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Travelers Indemnity Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Reply)(Reid, Meg)
April 27, 2020 Filing 11 Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Burke Plumbing & Heating, Inc.. (Rodrigues, Jordan)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (McDonagh, Christina)
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #8 Assented to Motion to Enlarge Timeframe to Respond to Travelers Indemnity Company of America's Motion to Dismiss until April 28, 2020. (Beatty, Barbara)
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 04/28/20 to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Burke Plumbing & Heating, Inc..(Matthews, Patrick)
March 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick T. Matthews on behalf of Burke Plumbing & Heating, Inc. (Matthews, Patrick)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan J. Rodrigues on behalf of Burke Plumbing & Heating, Inc. (Rodrigues, Jordan)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Travelers Indemnity Company of America. (Reid, Meg)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Travelers Indemnity Company of America.(Reid, Meg)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Weyland, Loren)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Indemnity Company of America ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8148202 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Reid, Meg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke Plumbing & Heating, Inc. v. Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burke Plumbing & Heating, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan J. Rodrigues
Represented By: Patrick T. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Represented By: Meg R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?