Piechowiak v. Integrity Fishing Corp.
Plaintiff: Rafal Piechowiak
Defendant: Integrity Fishing Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10508
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 741
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. OToole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly.(Lyness, Paul)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Regan on behalf of Integrity Fishing Corp. (Regan, Joseph)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Integrity Fishing Corp.. (McSweeney, Francis)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Integrity Fishing Corp..(McSweeney, Francis)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 SEAMAN'S AFFIDAVIT by Rafal Piechowiak. (Vieira, Leonardo)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Piechowiak against Integrity Fishing Corp. (Fee Status: Seaman), filed by Rafal Piechowiak. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Please refer to entry #2 )(Bond, Thomas) Modified on 3/12/2020 (Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piechowiak v. Integrity Fishing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrity Fishing Corp.
Represented By: Francis G. McSweeney
Represented By: Joseph A. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafal Piechowiak
Represented By: Thomas M. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?