HubSpot, Inc. v. Zoho Corporation Pvt. Ltd.
Plaintiff: HubSpot, Inc.
Defendant: Zoho Corporation Pvt. Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10520
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brett Schuman, James Lin, Megan Bettles. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brett Schuman, James Lin, and Megan Deanne Bettles Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-8185243 by HubSpot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Brett Schuman, #2 Exhibit B: Certificate of James Lin, #3 Exhibit C: Certificate of Megan Deanne Bettles)(Carroll, Robert)
March 25, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HubSpot, Inc.. (Carroll, Robert)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Zoho Corporation Pvt. Ltd.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd J. Marabella on behalf of HubSpot, Inc. (Marabella, Todd)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Carroll, Robert)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HubSpot, Inc.. (Carroll, Robert)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zoho Corporation Pvt. Ltd. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8155317 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by HubSpot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Categories Sheet)(Carroll, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HubSpot, Inc. v. Zoho Corporation Pvt. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HubSpot, Inc.
Represented By: Todd J. Marabella
Represented By: Robert D. Carroll
Represented By: Megan Deanne Bettles
Represented By: Brett Schuman
Represented By: James Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoho Corporation Pvt. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?