Biogen Inc. et al v. Creative Biolabs Inc.
Plaintiff: Biogen Inc. and University of Zurich
Defendant: Creative Biolabs Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10543
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. CONSENT JUDGMENT (Russo, Noreen)
May 13, 2020 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Assented to Motion to Approve Consent Judgment (Russo, Noreen)
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Biogen Inc., University of Zurich.. (Ware, Donald)
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Biogen Inc., University of Zurich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ware, Donald)
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Creative Biolabs Inc. served on 3/20/2020, answer due 4/10/2020. (Ware, Donald)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah S. Burg on behalf of Biogen Inc., University of Zurich (Burg, Sarah)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Creative Biolabs Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Biogen Inc.. (Ware, Donald)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Ware, Donald)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Creative Biolabs Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8160150 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Biogen Inc., University of Zurich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Civil Cover Sheet, #25 category form)(Ware, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biogen Inc. et al v. Creative Biolabs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Biolabs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biogen Inc.
Represented By: Donald R. Ware
Represented By: Sarah S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Zurich
Represented By: Donald R. Ware
Represented By: Sarah S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?