Misghina-Fitwi v. MacDonald et al
Plaintiff: Abel Misghina-Fitwi
Respondent: Superintendent Antone Moniz, Acting Secretary Chad Wolf and Sheriff Joseph D MacDonald
Case Number: 1:2020cv10552
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Referring Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Abel Misghina-Fitwi (Freidel, Irene)
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of Joseph D MacDonald, Antone Moniz, Chad Wolf (Johnson, Anita)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Antone Moniz, Superintendent of the Plymouth County Correctional Facility, shall be the sole respondent. The Clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of the petition upon Superintendent Moniz and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. The respondent shall, within 7 days of the date of this order, show good cause why the petition should not be granted. In order to give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the petitioner shall not be moved outside the District of Massachusetts without providing the Court 48 hours' advance notice of the move and the reason therefor. (PSSA, 3)
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton added. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), (Corrected Civil Cover Sheet) by Abel Misghina-Fitwi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Freidel, Irene)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER OF RECUSAL entered.The Court hereby RECUSES pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). The Clerk shall have the case redrawn to another District Judge.(Simeone, Maria)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (McKillop, Matthew)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (McKillop, Matthew)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), Irene C. Freidel (Attorney) by Abel Misghina-Fitwi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Freidel, Irene)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 Emergency PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Request for Humanitarian Release Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8162388 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Abel Misghina-Fitwi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Affidavit Abel Misghina-Fitwi, #4 Affidavit Darwin Kidane Tekie)(Freidel, Irene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Misghina-Fitwi v. MacDonald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superintendent Antone Moniz
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Joseph D MacDonald
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Misghina-Fitwi
Represented By: Irene C. Freidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?