Bosen v. Robertson et al
Plaintiff: Theodore L Bosen
Defendant: Thomas M Robertson and Caroline Robertson
Case Number: 1:2020cv10586
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Dever on behalf of Thomas M Robertson, Caroline Robertson (Dever, Joseph)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Dever on behalf of Thomas M Robertson, Caroline Robertson (Dever, Joseph)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Thomas M Robertson.(Murphy, Thomas)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Caroline Robertson.(Murphy, Thomas)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Executed Return of Service C Robertson)(Typadis, Archie)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Thomas M Robertson, Caroline Robertson. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Theodore L Bosen. (Attachments: #1 Local Category Form)(Typadis, Archie)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caroline Robertson, Thomas M Robertson Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8168822 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Theodore L Bosen.(Typadis, Archie) Modified on 3/24/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bosen v. Robertson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M Robertson
Represented By: Thomas A. Murphy
Represented By: Joseph P. Dever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Robertson
Represented By: Thomas A. Murphy
Represented By: Joseph P. Dever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore L Bosen
Represented By: Archie D. Typadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?