Harutyunyan v. Sargsyan
Petitioner: Hayk Harutyunyan
Respondent: Lilit Sargsyan
Case Number: 1:2020cv10650
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 16 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Telephone Conference held on 5/5/2020. Case called. Court had colloquy with counsel. Court requested that Petitioner obtain a determination/decision from the court of Armenia that the removal of the child was wrongful. Initial disclosures 5/14/2020. Discovery to be completed by 7/17/2020. Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/6/2020 & 8/7/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Indira Talwani. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@yahoo.com.) (Attorneys present: Canale, Sloane, Haytayan) (MacDonald, Gail)
May 1, 2020 Filing 15 APPENDIX/EXHIBIT re #14 Opposition to Motion by Lilit Sargsyan. (Haytayan, Harry)
May 1, 2020 Filing 14 Opposition re #9 MOTION to Expedite Status Conference - Ex Parte filed by Lilit Sargsyan. (Haytayan, Harry)
April 30, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Lilit Sargsyan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Haytayan, Harry)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Hayk Harutyunyan re #9 MOTION to Expedite Status Conference - Ex Parte as well as Electronic Order and Email with Call-In Instructions. (Sloane, Matthew)
April 27, 2020 Filing 11 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: Granting Motion for Expedited Scheduling Conference #9 . The clerk shall set a telephonic scheduling conference for May 5, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. Petitioner shall promptly serve a copy of this order on Respondent by first class mail and by email, if an email address is known, and shall file a certificate of service. (Telephone Conference set for 5/5/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Indira Talwani. Calling information will be provided by the clerk to counsel.) (MacDonald, Gail)
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob K. Baron on behalf of Hayk Harutyunyan (Baron, Jacob)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite Status Conference - Ex Parte by Hayk Harutyunyan.(Sloane, Matthew)
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Hayk Harutyunyan. Lilit Sargsyan served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Hayk Harutyunyan. (Sloane, Matthew)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Verified Petition for Return of Child to Armenia and Issuance of a Show Cause Order #1 seeks preliminary relief but does not include facts showing that immediate and irreparable injury, loss, or damage will result before Respondent can be heard in opposition, and includes no certification by counsel of any efforts made to give Respondent notice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1). Accordingly, to the extent Petitioner is seeking such relief ex parte based on the papers filed thus far, the request is DENIED. The court shall consider Petitioner's request for issuance of the proposed Show Cause Order after Petitioner's counsel files a certificate of service attesting to notice to Respondent, and Respondent has had an opportunity to respond. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Lilit Sargsyan. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Canale on behalf of Hayk Harutyunyan (Canale, John)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Hayk Harutyunyan. Document received: Proposed Order. (Sloane, Matthew)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Sloane on behalf of Hayk Harutyunyan (Sloane, Matthew)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lilit Sargsyan Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8180064 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Hayk Harutyunyan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Sloane, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harutyunyan v. Sargsyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lilit Sargsyan
Represented By: Harry M. Haytayan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hayk Harutyunyan
Represented By: Matthew W. Sloane
Represented By: John A. Canale
Represented By: Jacob K. Baron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?