Hache et al v. AIG Claims, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Hache and Heidi Hache
Defendant: AmWINS Group, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company and AIG Claims, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10652
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 15 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. (Lara, Miguel)
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 15, 2020 to Extend Time for State Court to Submit Certified Record Entries to Federal Court by AIG Claims, Inc., AmWINS Group, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'Donnell, Barbara)
April 30, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by AmWINS Group, Inc..(O'Donnell, Barbara)
April 13, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (Lara, Miguel)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Heidi Hache Waiver of Protection Afforded Minor Plaintiff Under F.R.C.P. 5.2(a) (Raphaelson, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by AIG Claims, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schneider, William)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Granite State Insurance Company. (Schneider, William)
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AIG Claims, Inc.. (Schneider, William)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by AIG Claims, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schneider, William)
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmWINS Group, Inc.. (O'Donnell, Barbara)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by AmWINS Group, Inc..(O'Donnell, Barbara)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Halley, Taylor)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara A. O'Donnell on behalf of AmWINS Group, Inc. (O'Donnell, Barbara)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AmWINS Group, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8180148 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Supplement Category Sheet)(O'Donnell, Barbara) (Attachment 9 replaced on 4/2/2020) (Lara, Miguel).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hache et al v. AIG Claims, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmWINS Group, Inc.
Represented By: Barbara A. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite State Insurance Company
Represented By: William A. Schneider
Represented By: Barbara A. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Claims, Inc.
Represented By: William A. Schneider
Represented By: Barbara A. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Hache
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Raphaelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Hache
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Raphaelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?