Gibson Foundation, Inc. v. Norris
Plaintiff: Gibson Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Rob Norris
Case Number: 1:2020cv10682
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #49 MOTION to Dismiss The Piano Mill Group, LLC's Counterclaims by Andrea E Bates on behalf of Gibson Foundation, Inc. filed by on behalf of Gibson Foundation, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
May 28, 2020 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Support re #49 MOTION to Dismiss The Piano Mill Group, LLC's Counterclaims filed by Gibson Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bates, Andrea)
May 28, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss The Piano Mill Group, LLC's Counterclaims by Gibson Foundation, Inc..(Bates, Andrea)
May 28, 2020 Filing 48 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Rob Norris.(Gibson, Daniel)
May 7, 2020 Filing 47 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Late Answer and Counterclaim #44 as counsel has failed to certify that they have conferred and attempted in good faith to resolve or narrow the issue as required by Local Rule 7.1(a)(2) and because the motion is unnecessary as the pleading is not late, and DENYING Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #9 as moot. The Order #29 transferring the case to this District did not address Defendant's challenge to personal jurisdiction and did not deny the Motion to Dismiss #9 . Unless a court sets a different time, where a motion to dismiss was filed, an answer is not due until 14 days after the court denies the motion or gives notice that it has postponed disposition until trial. See Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(a)(4)(A). As Defendant has now filed his Answer and Counterclaim #45 , the court denies the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #9 as moot. (Kelly, Danielle)
May 7, 2020 Filing 46 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: DENYING Motion for Entry of Default #40 as counsel has failed to certify that they have conferred and attempted in good faith to resolve or narrow the issue as required by Local Rule 7.1(a)(2). (Kelly, Danielle)
May 7, 2020 Filing 45 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Rob Norris by Rob Norris.(Gibson, Daniel)
May 7, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Answer and Counterclaim by Rob Norris.(Gibson, Daniel)
May 7, 2020 Filing 43 Opposition re #40 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Rob Norris. (Gibson, Daniel)
May 7, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Gibson on behalf of Rob Norris (Gibson, Daniel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Kurt Schuettinger, Esq. in Support re #40 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Gibson Foundation, Inc.. (Michaud, Richard) Modified on 5/7/2020: Corrected docket text to reflect document filed. (Kelly, Danielle).
May 6, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Entry of Default by Gibson Foundation, Inc..(Michaud, Richard)
April 28, 2020 Filing 39 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Andrea E. Bates.; ALLOWING #37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kurt Schuettinger. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 28, 2020 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kurt Schuettinger Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8216973 filed by Gibson Foundation, Inc.. (Michaud, Richard)
April 28, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kurt Schuettinger Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8216973 by Gibson Foundation, Inc..(Michaud, Richard)
April 28, 2020 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrea E. Bates Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8216931 filed by Gibson Foundation, Inc.. (Michaud, Richard)
April 28, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrea E. Bates Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8216931 by Gibson Foundation, Inc..(Michaud, Richard)
April 28, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard B. Michaud on behalf of Gibson Foundation, Inc. (Michaud, Richard)
April 24, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Schneider on behalf of Gibson Foundation, Inc. (Schneider, Nicholas)
April 8, 2020 Filing 32 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered adopting #27 Order. (Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2021. Discovery to be completed by 8/30/2021.) Status Conference set for 12/9/2020 02:15 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
April 7, 2020 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
April 7, 2020 Filing 30 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-01109.
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. #9 ) filed by Rob Norris d/b/a/the Piano Mill is GRANTED to the extent the motion requests that this case be transferred to a court having venue over the action. The Clerk of the Court shall TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, and close the file here. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/6/2020. (vh)
April 6, 2020 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/5/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2020. Discovery due by 8/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2021. Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 12/9/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 4/6/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
March 31, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 3/31/2020; ORDER to enter. (Tape #not recorded.) (Hearing lasted 1:10)(jwc)
March 24, 2020 Filing 26 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Rob Norris. (Cole, Jonathan)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Given the current responses to the outbreak of the coronavirus known as COVID-19, including the Court's Administrative Order No. 209 issued on March 16, 2019, the initial case management conference in this case, scheduled for March 31, 2020, at 1:30 p.m., will be held telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/18/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
March 3, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan Jacob Cole and Sye T. Hickey. (gb)
March 2, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (gb)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: On February 26, 2020 Plaintiff filed a Notice #23 withdrawing their motion #14 to disqualify counsel. Therefore, the motion to disqualify filed February 6, 2020, #14 is DENIED as moot. The initial case management conference is SCHEDULED for 1:30 p.m., Tuesday, March 31, 2020, in Courtroom No. 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/2/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
February 26, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by Gibson Foundation, Inc. re #14 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Bates, Andrea)
February 20, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Rob Norris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Martha Boyd, #2 Exhibit Declaration of John Hicks)(Hicks, John)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Plaintiff's request to stay further proceedings is GRANTED IN PART as to the initial case management conference and discovery. As to all other matters, including as to briefing of the pending motion to dismiss and the pending motion to disqualify, the request is DENIED. The initial case management conference presently set for March 23, 2020 ( #12 ) is CANCELLED to be rescheduled following resolution of the motion to disqualify. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 2/14/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to re #9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Rob Norris. (Cole, Jonathan)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Defendant and Stay Further Proceedings ( #14 ) filed February 6, 2020, is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Holmes for a Report and Recommendation. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/10/2020. (gb)
February 7, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Erin Chegwidden filed by Gibson Foundation, Inc. re: #16 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email chain between Dorn and Piano Mill)(Harvey, Timothy)
February 7, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Andrea Bates filed by Gibson Foundation, Inc. re: #16 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Harvey, Timothy)
February 7, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Gibson Foundation, Inc. (Harvey, Timothy)
February 6, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of #14 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Gibson Foundation, Inc. (Harvey, Timothy)
February 6, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Gibson Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Erin Salmon Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Harvey to Cole and Hickey, #3 Exhibit C - Jan. 31 Email from Harvey to Cole and Hickey)(Harvey, Timothy)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Andrea E. Bates to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 2/3/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
January 31, 2020 CA State Bar status verified as active for Andrea E. Bates. (gb)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Defendant filed a motion to dismiss with supporting memorandum ( #9 , #10 ). The Clerk is directed to forward the motion to the Honorable Waverly D. Crenshaw, Chief District Judge for his consideration of Defendant's motion to dismiss. Initial Case Management Conference RESET for 3/23/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/31/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
January 29, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Andrea E. Bates to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3075968) by Gibson Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Harvey, Timothy)
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss; MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Rob Norris. (Cole, Jonathan)
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rob Norris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Robert Norris)(Cole, Jonathan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Gibson Foundation, Inc. Rob Norris served on 1/3/2020. (Harvey, Timothy)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Rob Norris. Service copies at intake to be picked up by counsel. (jw)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/12/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jw)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
December 11, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Timothy G. Harvey. (jw)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gibson Foundation, Inc. (jw)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rob Norris (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3048360), filed by Gibson Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Letter 3/22/2019, #3 Exhibit B - Letter 11/19/2019)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson Foundation, Inc. v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Norris
Represented By: Sye T. Hickey
Represented By: Jonathan Jacob Cole
Represented By: Daniel J. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gibson Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy G. Harvey
Represented By: Andrea E Bates
Represented By: Kurt Schuettinger
Represented By: Richard B. Michaud
Represented By: Nicholas J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?