Augusto et al v. Moniz
Petitioner: Pedro Wabibi Augusto, Felipe De Lima Moreira Barros, Hazem Khalil El Beshtawi, Selemun Meles, Jesus Paulino-Bello, Esquelin Montilla Soto, Rahim Abdur, Santo Amador-Guerrero, Quraish Kiberu, Pablo Navarette, Oscar Ramirez Garcia, Jose Hernandez Mendez, Ricardo Ramirez, Jose Luis Rodriguez Martinez, Albano Slatineanu, Jose Rene Hernandez Gomes, Ramon Sanchez Vasquez, Guadalupe Velez Chavez, Maninder Singh, Manuel Cela-Caguana, Sandeep Singh, Danilo Gomez Ayala, Rainer Mora-Polanco, Jorge Martinez Delgado, Victor Silva Soares, Rocard Mbuma, Miguel Carpio, Luis Zhagnay-Saeteros, Morcos F Chaves Chaves, Jagmohan Jagmohan, Evens Dry, Fausto Dumaguala, Rafael Dos Santos Rodriguez, Manuel Lema Mizhirumbay, Rey De Leon Merida, Hector Pojoy-Calel, Michael Langa, Kawalpreet Singh, Carlos Eduardo Santos, Pedro Cuba, You Xiajin, Ronnie Ssesanga, Nelson Tisnado Diaz, Leroy Daley, Teofilo Niz Chilel, Mynor Jacinto-Ramirez, Sakhawat Hossain, Nazim Khan, Freddy Vallejos Rivera, Henry Navas-Ramos, Mohammad Ahmed, Galindo Martin-Solis, Manuel Maldonado-Maldonado, Paul Atabong Fossem, Brayan Arango Sepulveda, Katambwa Patrick Ndaya, Abdy Nizeyimana, Rodrigue Henoud, Rigoberto Castro Cortes, Nassim Nezali, Wilmer Espinel Alvarado, Jewel Ahmed, Cleberson Quadrelli, Cristian Fernando Maza Charco, Kaiany Feliciano Da Silva, Rogerio Pereira daSilva and Tareq Ahmed
Respondent: John D. McDonald, Jr. and Antone Moniz
Consolidated Defendant: Todd Lyons
Case Number: 1:2020cv10685
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 132 Letter/request (non-motion) from Mohammad Rasel Ahmed. (McDonagh, Christina)
June 2, 2020 Filing 131 STATUS REPORT by Antone Moniz. (Weida, Jason)
May 28, 2020 Filing 130 REPLY to Response to #84 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Abdy Nizeyimana, Cleberson Quadrelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McCready, Laura)
May 28, 2020 Filing 129 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Antone Moniz re 86 Order . (Weida, Jason)
May 28, 2020 Filing 127 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #121 Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
May 28, 2020 Filing 126 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #120 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
May 27, 2020 Filing 125 Copy re 124 Order, mailed to all Pro Se petitioners and Edwin Patricio Allaico Morocho on 5/27/2020. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 27, 2020 Filing 124 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Edwin Patricio Allaico Morocho's request to join the petition, [ECF No. #118 ], is DENIED. Mr. Allaico Morocho is being detained in a different unit at PCCF than the petitioners. Given the pending motion for class certification, [ECF No. #84 ], the Court will not expand the issues raised by petitioners to include other units. Mr. Allaico Morocho may file a separate complaint regarding the issues he raises in his request.(McDonagh, Christina)
May 26, 2020 Filing 123 DECLARATION re #120 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply of Jeffrey B. Rubin, Esq. by Evens Dry, Abdy Nizeyimana, Cleberson Quadrelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McCready, Laura)
May 26, 2020 Filing 122 DECLARATION re #120 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply of Dr. Yonatan Grad and Emma Accorsi by Evens Dry, Abdy Nizeyimana, Cleberson Quadrelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McCready, Laura)
May 26, 2020 Filing 121 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Declaration of Christopher F. Warner and Exhibits by Evens Dry, Abdy Nizeyimana, Cleberson Quadrelli.(McCready, Laura)
May 26, 2020 Filing 120 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Evens Dry, Abdy Nizeyimana, Cleberson Quadrelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McCready, Laura)
May 26, 2020 Filing 119 AMENDED COMPLAINT (second) against Antone Moniz, filed by Evens Dry, Abdy Nizeyimana, Cleberson Quadrelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Appendix)(McCready, Laura)
May 26, 2020 Filing 118 Letter/request (non-motion) from a Detainee requesting to Join this case as Petitioners. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 26, 2020 Filing 117 Copy re #116 Protective Order mailed to all Pro Se petitioners on 5/26/2020. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 26, 2020 Filing 116 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER ENTERED, granting #107 Assented to MOTION for Protective Order filed by Antone Moniz.(McDonagh, Christina)
May 21, 2020 Filing 115 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #111 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
May 21, 2020 Filing 114 Copy re 113 Order on Motion to Amend, 112 Order, mailed to all Pro Se petitioners on 5/21/2020. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 21, 2020 Filing 113 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Petitioners filed a motion to amend. [ECF No. #83 ]. Respondent takes no position on the motion. [ECF No. #106 ]. The motion to amend, [ECF No. #83 ], is GRANTED. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 21, 2020 Filing 112 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Because the parties have not raised any objections, see [ECF Nos. #103 , #105 ], the clerk will add Nassim Nezali, Jagmohan Jagmohan, and Katambwa Patrick Ndaya as petitioners. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 21, 2020 Filing 111 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Antone Moniz.(Goldstein, Rachel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 110 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #109 Motion to Seal Document (McDonagh, Christina)
May 20, 2020 Filing 109 MOTION to Seal Document #106 Response to Motion Exhibit A (Compendium of Summaries) by Antone Moniz.(Weida, Jason)
May 20, 2020 Filing 108 Opposition re #84 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Rachel)
May 20, 2020 Filing 107 Assented to MOTION for Protective Order by Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weida, Jason)
May 20, 2020 Filing 106 RESPONSE to Motion re #83 MOTION to Amend Petition filed by Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Weida, Jason) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/21/2020) (McDonagh, Christina).
May 19, 2020 Filing 105 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Antone Moniz re 101 Order, 99 Order, . (Weida, Jason)
May 19, 2020 Filing 104 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Antone Moniz re 86 Order . (Weida, Jason)
May 19, 2020 Filing 103 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Evens Dry, Abdy Nizeyimana, Cleberson Quadrelli . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McFadden, Daniel)
May 19, 2020 Filing 102 STATUS REPORT by Antone Moniz. (Weida, Jason)
May 18, 2020 Filing 101 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties are hereby ordered to notify the Court by May 20, 2020 if they object to adding Katambwa Patrick Ndaya as s petitioner. See [ECF No. #100 ]. Katambwa Patrick Ndaya indicates that they are also being held in Unit C3 at the Plymouth County Correctional Facility. [Id.].(McDonagh, Christina)
May 18, 2020 Filing 100 Letter/request (non-motion) from Katambwa Patrick Ndaya to Join case. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 15, 2020 Filing 99 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties are hereby ordered to notify the Court by May 20, 2020 if they object to adding Nassim Nezali and Jagmohan Jagmohan as petitioners. See [ECF No. #98 ]. Nezali and Jagmohan indicate that they are also being held in Unit C3 at the Plymouth County Correctional Facility. [Id.]. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 15, 2020 Filing 98 Letter/request (non-motion) from Two Detainees requesting to Join this case as Petitioners. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 13, 2020 Filing 97 STATUS REPORT by Antone Moniz. (Weida, Jason)
May 12, 2020 Filing 96 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #84 MOTION to Certify Class , #83 MOTION to Amend Petition (Attachments: #1 Savino Decision)(McFadden, Daniel)
May 12, 2020 Filing 95 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Antone Moniz re 86 Order . (Weida, Jason)
May 12, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Goldstein on behalf of Antone Moniz (Goldstein, Rachel)
May 11, 2020 Filing 93 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #92 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Anand V. Balakrishnan, Eunice H. Cho, David C. Fathi, Omar C. Jadwat, Rebecca A. Ojserkis and Michael K. T. Tan. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 11, 2020 Filing 92 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of 6 Filing fee: $ 600, receipt number 0101-8236016 by Evens Dry, Abdy Nizeyimana, Cleberson Quadrelli. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Anand V. Balakrishnan, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Eunice H. Cho, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of David C. Fathi, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Omar C. Jadwat, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Rebecca A. Ojserkis, #6 Affidavit Affidavit of Michael K. T. Tan)(McCready, Laura)
May 8, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen A. Lagana on behalf of Kaiany Feliciano Da Silva (Lagana, Stephen)
May 8, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen A. Lagana on behalf of Kaiany Feliciano Da Silva (Lagana, Stephen)
May 8, 2020 Filing 89 Copy re 86 Order mailed to all Pro Se petitioners on 5/8/2020. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 7, 2020 Filing 88 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Antone Moniz re 86 Order . (Weida, Jason)
May 6, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen A. Lagana on behalf of Hector Pojoy-Calel (Lagana, Stephen)
May 6, 2020 Filing 86 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Respondent is hereby ordered to notify the Court when a petitioner in this matter is removed, transferred, or released from Plymouth. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 5, 2020 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM in Support re #84 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Evens Dry, Abdy Nizeyimana, Cleberson Quadrelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McFadden, Daniel)
May 5, 2020 Filing 84 MOTION to Certify Class by Evens Dry, Abdy Nizeyimana, Cleberson Quadrelli.(McFadden, Daniel)
May 5, 2020 Filing 83 MOTION to Amend Petition by Evens Dry, Abdy Nizeyimana, Cleberson Quadrelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McFadden, Daniel)
May 5, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan B. Church on behalf of Evens Dry, Abdy Nizeyimana, Cleberson Quadrelli (Church, Susan)
May 5, 2020 Filing 81 Copy re 79 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction mailed to all Pro Se petitioners on 5/5/2020. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 5, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly R. Maidman on behalf of Abdy Nizeyimana (Maidman, Molly)
May 5, 2020 Filing 79 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. For the reasons set forth below, Respondent's motion to dismiss, [ECF No. #21 ], is DENIED. The Court will first address Respondent's challenge to the Court's habeas jurisdiction. It is without question that habeas relief is available to Petitioners who seek release from their confinement. Gonzalez-Fuentes v. Molina, 607 F.3d 864, 873 (1st Cir. 2010) (stating that relief under 2241 is available "[i]f the prisoner is seeking what can be fairly described as a quantum change in the level of custody" such as release or freedom subject to the constraints of bond or parole (quoting Graham v. Broglin, 922 F.2d 379, 381 (7th Cir. 1991))). Less clear is whether an individual may challenge the conditions of their confinementrather than the legality or duration of their confinementthrough a habeas petition. See Wilborn v. Mansukhani, 795 F. App'x 157, 163 (4th Cir. 2019) (discussing circuit split on the issue). Although many courts are reluctant to proceed on a conditions of confinement petition, the First Circuit has repeatedly stated in dicta that such petitions are not automatically barred from consideration. United States v. DeLeon, 444 F.3d 41, 59 (1st Cir. 2006) ("If the conditions of incarceration raise Eighth Amendment concerns, habeas corpus is available."); Brennan v. Cunningham, 813 F.2d 1, 4 (1st Cir. 1987) ("In Preiser, 411 U.S. at 499-500, the Court explicitly left open the possibility that a challenge to prison conditions, cognizable under 1983, might also be brought as a habeas corpus claim."); Miller v. United States, 564 F.2d 103, 105 (1st Cir. 1977) ("Section 2241 provides a remedy for a federal prisoner who contests the conditions of his confinement...."). Although Respondent frames Petitioners' request as one that solely challenges the conditions of their confinement in light of the risks of COVID-19, [ECF No. #22 at 16-18], the Court notes that Petitioners have asked for several forms of relief, including release. See [ECF No. #1 ]; see also Verma v. Doll, No. 4:20-CV-00014, 2020 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 62429, at *9 (M.D. Pa. Apr. 9, 2020) ("[Petitioner] requests immediate release from custody based on what he perceives to be constitutionally deficient conditions of confinement that threaten his health and life. This is a habeas remedy."). Because Petitioners seek release as well as changes to the conditions of their confinement, the Court will exercise jurisdiction over their petition. Respondent next challenges the petition as failing to state a claim on which relief may be granted. [ECF No. #22 at 18]. In reviewing a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6), the Court must accept as true all well-pleaded facts, analyze those facts in the light most favorable to the plaintiff, and draw all reasonable factual inferences in favor of the plaintiff. See Gilbert v. City of Chicopee, 915 F.3d 74, 80 (1st Cir. 2019). In light of the current pandemic and their continued detention, Petitioners have alleged facts sufficient to "state a claim to relief that is plausible on its face." See Bell Atl. Corp. v. Twombly, 550 U.S. 544, 570 (2007); [ECF No. #1 ]. Although the parties have filed declarations in support of their respective positions on the motion to dismiss, additional discovery is necessary to determine whether the measures the Plymouth County Correctional Facility is taking are adequate to reasonably protect Petitioners based on the allegations raised in their petition. Lastly, the Court will not address Petitioners' standing, as Respondent has withdrawn this as a basis for dismissal. See [ECF No. #61 -1 at 2]. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 5, 2020 Filing 78 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 5/5/2020. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Weida, Lagana, Warner, Pomerleau, Rubin, McCreedy, McFadden, Keefe, Holper) (Folan, Karen)
May 5, 2020 Filing 77 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The petition, [ECF No. #1 ], is moot as to the following petitioners who are dismissed from this action: Miguel Carpio, Rey De Leon Merida, Hazem Khalil El Beshtawi, Rodrigue Henoud, Jose Rene Hernandez Gomes, Mynor Jacinto-Ramirez, Manuel Lema Mizhirumbay, Rainer Mora-Polanco, Pablo Navarette, Henry Navas-Ramos, Teofilo Niz Chilel, Ricardo Ramirez, Oscar Ramirez Garcia, Albano Slatineanu, Ronnie Ssesanga, Guadalupe Velez Chavez, You Xiajin, Tareq Ahmed and Santo Amador-Guerrero(McDonagh, Christina)
May 5, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K. McCready on behalf of Evens Dry, Abdy Nizeyimana, Cleberson Quadrelli (McCready, Laura)
May 5, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. McFadden on behalf of Evens Dry, Abdy Nizeyimana, Cleberson Quadrelli (McFadden, Daniel)
May 5, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by William Keefe on behalf of Sandeep Singh (Keefe, William)
May 5, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by William Keefe on behalf of Manuel Cela-Caguana (Keefe, William)
May 5, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by William Keefe on behalf of Pedro Cuba (Keefe, William)
May 5, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by William Keefe on behalf of Ramon Sanchez Vasquez (Keefe, William)
May 5, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by William Keefe on behalf of Cristian Fernando Maza Charco (Keefe, William)
May 5, 2020 Filing 69 STATUS REPORT by Antone Moniz. (Weida, Jason)
May 4, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey B. Rubin on behalf of Cleberson Quadrelli (Rubin, Jeffrey)
May 4, 2020 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weida, Jason)
May 1, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by William Shaw McDermott on behalf of Abdy Nizeyimana (McDermott, William)
May 1, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Glass on behalf of Abdy Nizeyimana (Glass, Andrew)
May 1, 2020 Filing 64 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #www.public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Further Status Conference set for 5/5/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs only for Evens Dry, Rogerio Pereira DaSilva, Felipe De Lima Moreira Barros, Cleberson Quadrelli, Jose Hernandez Mendez, Abdy Nizeyimana and Victor Silva Soares who are the petitioners with ripe motions to dismiss.(Folan, Karen)
May 1, 2020 Filing 63 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 5/1/2020. Colloquy re: motions to dismiss. Further hearing set for 5/5/20 at 10:30 a.m. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Weida, Warner, Rubin, Lagana, Pomerleau, Holper) (Folan, Karen)
May 1, 2020 Filing 62 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Respondent's motion for leave to reply, [ECF No. #43 ], is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Respondent may file a reply in connection with his motion to dismiss the petition as to all Petitioners. See [ECF No. #21 ]. The motion is otherwise denied as moot in light of Petitioner Espinal Alvarado's release. See [ECF Nos. #27 , 57 ]. (McDonagh, Christina)
April 30, 2020 Filing 61 STATUS REPORT Updated by Antone Moniz. (Weida, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2020: #1 Unredacted Status Report) (McDonagh, Christina).
April 30, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd C. Pomerleau on behalf of Cleberson Quadrelli (Pomerleau, Todd)
April 30, 2020 Filing 59 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #www.public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Status Conference set for 5/1/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs only for Evens Dry, Rogerio Pereira DaSilva, Felipe De Lima Moreira Barros, Cleberson Quadrelli, Jose Hernandez Mendez, Abdy Nizeyimana and Victor Silva Soares who are the petitioners with ripe motions to dismiss.(Folan, Karen) Modified on 4/30/2020 to add Soares (Folan, Karen).
April 30, 2020 Filing 58 First RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Alvarado Petition), #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Felipe De Lima Moreira Barros, Jose Hernandez Mendez, Victor Silva Soares, Rogerio Pereira daSilva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Declaration of Attorney Lagana, #2 Exhibit B) Declaration of Jonathan Luis Golob, #3 Exhibit C) Declaration of Dr. Greifinger, MD, #4 Exhibit D) Declarattion of Dr. Greifinger, MD)(Lagana, Stephen)
April 30, 2020 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund, for $5.00 paid on 04/29/2020, receipt number 0101-8218962. (Tran, Henry)
April 30, 2020 Filing 57 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. In light of Respondent and Petitioner Espinal Alvarado's joint stipulation of dismissal, [ECF No. #56 ], Respondent's motion to dismiss as to Petitioner Espinal Alvarado, [ECF No. #27 ], is DENIED as moot. (McDonagh, Christina)
April 29, 2020 Filing 56 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wilmer Espinel Alvarado. (McFadden, Daniel)
April 29, 2020 Filing 55 STATUS REPORT by Wilmer Espinel Alvarado. (McFadden, Daniel)
April 29, 2020 Filing 54 First MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Alvarado Petition), #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cleberson Quadrelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Alien of Interview for Review of Custody Status)(Rubin, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2020 Filing 53 First Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Alvarado Petition), #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rogerio Pereira daSilva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Lagana, Stephen)
April 29, 2020 Filing 52 First Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Alvarado Petition), #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Felipe De Lima Moreira Barros. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Lagana, Stephen)
April 29, 2020 Filing 51 STATUS REPORT by Antone Moniz. (Weida, Jason)
April 29, 2020 Filing 50 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #46 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
April 29, 2020 Filing 49 Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Evens Dry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Holper, Mary)
April 29, 2020 Filing 48 Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8218979 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Evens Dry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Holper, Mary)
April 29, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary P. Holper on behalf of Evens Dry (Holper, Mary)
April 29, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION to Seal by Abdy Nizeyimana.(McDonagh, Christina)
April 29, 2020 Filing 45 First Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Abdy Nizeyimana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Christ Mavi Bafouana Mpandzou, #2 Exhibit Maine State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Warner, Christopher) (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/29/2020) (McDonagh, Christina). (Attachment 4 replaced on 4/29/2020) (McDonagh, Christina).
April 29, 2020 Filing 44 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On April 23, 2020, Judge Saris ordered Petitioner Espinal Alvarado released unless he received a bond hearing within 7 calendar days. No. 1:20-cv-10309-PBS, ECF No. 18. The parties are to advise the Court by end of day on April 30, 2020 as to whether Petitioner Espinal Alvarado received a bond hearing and whether he has been or is set to be released.(McDonagh, Christina)
April 28, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memoranda by Antone Moniz.(Weida, Jason)
April 28, 2020 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 Petition by Pedro Wabibi Augusto (McDonagh, Christina)
April 28, 2020 Filing 41 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Hennry Ramos (McDonagh, Christina)
April 26, 2020 Filing 40 DECLARATION re #35 Opposition to Motion, of Susan Church, Esq. by Wilmer Espinal Alvarado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McFadden, Daniel)
April 26, 2020 Filing 39 DECLARATION re #35 Opposition to Motion, of Natalie Santiago by Wilmer Espinal Alvarado. (McFadden, Daniel)
April 26, 2020 Filing 38 DECLARATION re #35 Opposition to Motion, of Matthew Segal, Esq. by Wilmer Espinal Alvarado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(McFadden, Daniel)
April 26, 2020 Filing 37 DECLARATION re #35 Opposition to Motion, of Dr. Katherine Peeler by Wilmer Espinal Alvarado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McFadden, Daniel)
April 26, 2020 Filing 36 DECLARATION re #35 Opposition to Motion, of Dr. Robert Greifinger by Wilmer Espinal Alvarado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McFadden, Daniel)
April 26, 2020 Filing 35 Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Alvarado Petition), #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wilmer Espinal Alvarado. (McFadden, Daniel)
April 24, 2020 Filing 34 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ahmed Tareq, Ronnie Ssesanena, Ricardo Ramirez, Saltineanu Albano Ion, You Jia Xin, Rey Vinicio De Leon, Mynor Isauro Sacinto Rameriez, Henoud Rodriguez, Eduardo Oscar Garcia Ramirez, Alberto Veiez Chavez, Manuel B. Mizhirumbay, Rainer Mora, and Jose Rene Hernandez Gomes (McDonagh, Christina)
April 21, 2020 Filing 33 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Alvarado Petition) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weida, Jason)
April 17, 2020 Filing 32 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #30 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
April 17, 2020 Filing 31 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #29 Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
April 16, 2020 Filing 30 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Antone Moniz.(Weida, Jason)
April 16, 2020 Filing 29 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Ex. F, Ex. G, and Ex. H to Respondent's Memorandum in Support of His Motion to Deny Alvarado's Petition (Doc. # 28) by Antone Moniz.(Weida, Jason)
April 16, 2020 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Alvarado Petition) filed by Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F (Under Seal), #7 Exhibit G (Under Seal), #8 Exhibit H (Under Seal), #9 Exhibit I)(Weida, Jason) (Attachment 6 replaced on 4/17/2020) (McDonagh, Christina). (Attachment 7 replaced on 4/17/2020) (McDonagh, Christina). (Attachment 8 replaced on 4/17/2020) (McDonagh, Christina).
April 16, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Alvarado Petition) by Antone Moniz.(Weida, Jason)
April 16, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kiberu Quraish (Freidel, Irene)
April 15, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K. McCready on behalf of Wilmer Espinal Alvarado (McCready, Laura)
April 15, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana Lafaille on behalf of Wilmer Espinal Alvarado (Lafaille, Adriana)
April 15, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of Wilmer Espinal Alvarado (Segal, Matthew)
April 15, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Weida, Jason)
April 15, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Antone Moniz.(Weida, Jason)
April 15, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Weida on behalf of Antone Moniz (Weida, Jason)
April 14, 2020 Filing 19 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. "As allowed by Paragraph 4 of the Standing Procedural Order Regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases, the Court hereby allows immediate electronic access to the filings in this case. The parties may make filings under seal, with a redacted public version where appropriate and subject to review by the Court and are reminded to redact consistent with the requirements of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2(a). All other provisions of the Standing Procedural Order shall remain in effect. Further, the limitation on internet publication of paper copies during the first 30 days after filing, as set forth in Paragraph 3, is expanded to include the internet publication of documents obtained electronically during this same 30 day period." (PSSA, 5)
April 14, 2020 Filing 18 Remark. Emergency Amended Petition #8 and supporting declarations #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , and #13 , sent by email to United States Attorney's Office (Ray Farquhar, Esq., Michael Sady, Esq., Ellen Souris) on 4/14/2020 @ 2:18pm. (PSSA, 3)
April 14, 2020 Filing 17 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re Emergency Amended Petition #8 filed by Petitioner Espinal Alvarado. 1. The Clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of the emergency amended petition upon Superintendent Moniz and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. 2. The respondent shall, no later than Thursday, April. 16, 2020, file a response to Espinal Alvarados emergency amended petition. 3. The Clerk is not required to serve a paper copy of this order on any petitioner. (PSSA, 3)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (McDonagh, Christina)
April 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan B. Church on behalf of Wilmer Espinal Alvarado (Church, Susan)
April 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Wilmer Espinal Alvarado re #8 EMERGENCY Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Injunctive Relief (McFadden, Daniel)
April 13, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #8 Amended Complaint of Matthew Segal, Esq. by Wilmer Espinal Alvarado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(McFadden, Daniel)
April 13, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION re #8 Amended Complaint of Susan Church, Esq. by Wilmer Espinal Alvarado. (McFadden, Daniel)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION re #8 Amended Complaint of Michael Felsen, Esq. by Wilmer Espinal Alvarado. (McFadden, Daniel)
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION re #8 Amended Complaint of Dr. Robert Greifinger by Wilmer Espinal Alvarado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McFadden, Daniel)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION re #8 Amended Complaint of Dr. Louis Golob by Wilmer Espinal Alvarado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McFadden, Daniel)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 EMERGENCY Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Injunctive Relief against Antone Moniz, filed by Wilmer Espinal Alvarado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Appendix)(McFadden, Daniel) Modified on 4/14/2020 to correct docket text to indicate emergency filing (McDonagh, Christina).
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. McFadden on behalf of Wilmer Espinal Alvarado (McFadden, Daniel)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher F. Warner on behalf of Abdy Nizeyimana (Warner, Christopher)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Irene C. Freidel on behalf of Kiberu Quraish (Freidel, Irene)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen A. Lagana on behalf of Felipe De Lima Moreira Barros, Jose Hernandez, Victor Silva Soares, Rogerio Pereira daSilva (Lagana, Stephen)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. 1. Petitioners shall, within twenty-eight (28) days, pay the $5.00 filing fee. 2. Antone Moniz, Superintendent of PCCF, shall be substituted as the sole respondent. 3. The Clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of the petition upon Superintendent Moniz and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. 4. The respondent shall, no later than Wednesday, April. 15, 2020, file a response to the petition. (PSSA, 3)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION by Immigration and Customs Enforcement Detainees of Plymouth County Correctional Facility, filed by Pedro Wabibi Augusto.(Danieli, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Augusto et al v. Moniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pedro Wabibi Augusto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Felipe De Lima Moreira Barros
Represented By: Stephen A. Lagana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hazem Khalil El Beshtawi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Selemun Meles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesus Paulino-Bello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Esquelin Montilla Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rahim Abdur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Santo Amador-Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Quraish Kiberu
Represented By: Irene C. Freidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pablo Navarette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oscar Ramirez Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Hernandez Mendez
Represented By: Stephen A. Lagana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ricardo Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Luis Rodriguez Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Albano Slatineanu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Rene Hernandez Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ramon Sanchez Vasquez
Represented By: William Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Guadalupe Velez Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maninder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Manuel Cela-Caguana
Represented By: William Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sandeep Singh
Represented By: William Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danilo Gomez Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rainer Mora-Polanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jorge Martinez Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Victor Silva Soares
Represented By: Stephen A. Lagana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rocard Mbuma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miguel Carpio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis Zhagnay-Saeteros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Morcos F Chaves Chaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jagmohan Jagmohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Evens Dry
Represented By: Michael K.T. Tan
Represented By: David C. Fathi
Represented By: Mary P. Holper
Represented By: Susan B. Church
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Laura K. McCready
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Represented By: Eunice H. Cho
Represented By: Rebecca A. Ojserkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fausto Dumaguala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rafael Dos Santos Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Manuel Lema Mizhirumbay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rey De Leon Merida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hector Pojoy-Calel
Represented By: Stephen A. Lagana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Langa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kawalpreet Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carlos Eduardo Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pedro Cuba
Represented By: William Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: You Xiajin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronnie Ssesanga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nelson Tisnado Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leroy Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Teofilo Niz Chilel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mynor Jacinto-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sakhawat Hossain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nazim Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Freddy Vallejos Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Henry Navas-Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mohammad Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Galindo Martin-Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Manuel Maldonado-Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Atabong Fossem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brayan Arango Sepulveda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Katambwa Patrick Ndaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abdy Nizeyimana
Represented By: Michael K.T. Tan
Represented By: Andrew C. Glass
Represented By: David C. Fathi
Represented By: Susan B. Church
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Laura K. McCready
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Represented By: Molly R. Maidman
Represented By: Eunice H. Cho
Represented By: Rebecca A. Ojserkis
Represented By: Christopher F. Warner
Represented By: William Shaw McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rodrigue Henoud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rigoberto Castro Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nassim Nezali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wilmer Espinel Alvarado
Represented By: Susan B. Church
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Represented By: Laura K. McCready
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jewel Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cleberson Quadrelli
Represented By: Michael K.T. Tan
Represented By: David C. Fathi
Represented By: Todd C. Pomerleau
Represented By: Susan B. Church
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Laura K. McCready
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Rubin
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Represented By: Eunice H. Cho
Represented By: Rebecca A. Ojserkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cristian Fernando Maza Charco
Represented By: William Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kaiany Feliciano Da Silva
Represented By: Stephen A. Lagana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rogerio Pereira daSilva
Represented By: Stephen A. Lagana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tareq Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John D. McDonald, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Represented By: Rachel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Todd Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?