PLINIO v. WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MARK PLINIO
Defendant: John Does 1-10, ABC COS. 1-10, Amazon.com Services, Inc. and WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10699
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Referring Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 25 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #24 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
May 14, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Continue to Retain Local Counsel by MARK PLINIO.(McKillop, Matthew)
May 4, 2020 Filing 23 Judge Denise J. Casper: Standing Order Regarding Appearance of Counsel Via Telephone or Videoconference(Hourihan, Lisa)
May 4, 2020 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Scheduling Conference set for 5/15/2020 12:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the sessions courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #www.public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Courts general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(Hourihan, Lisa)
April 30, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Amazon.com Services, Inc. & Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.. (Bazarian, Stephen)
April 15, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C. Bazarian on behalf of WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC. (Bazarian, Stephen)
April 15, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C. Bazarian on behalf of Amazon.com Services, Inc. (Bazarian, Stephen)
April 13, 2020 Filing 18 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa)
April 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
April 10, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Denise J. Casper added. Judge Indira Talwani no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
April 10, 2020 Filing 15 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(MacDonald, Gail)
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-00440.
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 4/8/2020. (abr)
April 8, 2020 Filing 11 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 4/8/2020. (abr)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC. re #5 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Massachusetts (MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that defendants Amazon.com Services Inc. and Whole Food Marcket Group, Inc. has until 3/3/2020 to submit reply papers. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 2/25/2020. (abr)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 Letter re #5 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Massachusetts , #7 Brief in Opposition to Motion. (MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MARK PLINIO re #5 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Massachusetts (LEONARDIS, NICHOLAS)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER- The Initial rule 16 conference scheduled for March 2, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni is adjourned with no new date. Parties are to notify the Court upon decision of the pending motion to Transfer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
February 10, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Massachusetts . Motion set for 3/2/2020 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Massachusetts by WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Correspondence)(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC..(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 2:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/15/2020. (abr)
January 14, 2020 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON.COM, INC., WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC.. (MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC. from MIDDLESEX COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number MID-L-8645-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10248780), filed by MARK PLINIO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER)
January 14, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: When entering parties make sure to add ALL plaintiffs and defendants as listed on the caption of the original state court complaint. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PLINIO v. WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK PLINIO
Represented By: NICHOLAS J. LEONARDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COS. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER EUGENE MCINTYRE
Represented By: Stephen C. Bazarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER EUGENE MCINTYRE
Represented By: Stephen C. Bazarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?