Kiberu v.Moniz
Plaintiff: Quraish Kiberu
Defendant: Acting Secretary CHAD F. WOLF, Sheriff Joseph D. McDonald, Jr. and Superintendent Antone Moniz
Respondent: Chad F. Wolf and Antone Moniz
Case Number: 1:2020cv10709
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Telephone conference originally set for 4/14/20 is canceled. (Folan, Karen)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion to Dismiss (Folan, Karen)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION to Dismiss by Antone Moniz.(Farquhar, Rayford)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of Antone Moniz (Farquhar, Rayford)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 4/14/2020 01:30 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Antone Moniz, Superintendent of the Plymouth County Correctional Facility, shall be the sole respondent. 2. he Clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of the petition on Superintendent Moniz and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. 3. he respondent shall, no later than 11am on Tuesday, April 14, 2020, file a status report. As necessary, the Court will set a later date for formal response to the petition. 4. The Court will hold a telephone conference at 1:30pm on Tuesday, April 14, 2020. Counsel for the petitioner and the respondent shall contact Karen Folan, courtroom deputy clerk, to receive the call-in number for the conference. 5. To give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the petitioner shall not be moved outside the District of Massachusetts without providing the Court 48 hours advance notice of the move and the reason therefor. (PSSA, 3)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Baker, Casey)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), by Quraish Kiberu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Freidel, Irene)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 Emergency PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Request for Humanitarian Release Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8191103 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Quraish Kiberu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Freidel, Irene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiberu v.Moniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary CHAD F. WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Joseph D. McDonald, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Antone Moniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quraish Kiberu
Represented By: Irene C. Freidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?