Barrett et al v. CarGuard Administration, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Barrett and Matthew Silverman
Defendant: Vehicle Protection Specialists LLC, CarGuard Administration, Inc. and Auto Protecht LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv10746
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. 60 DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (McDonagh, Christina)
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Joseph Barrett, Matthew Silverman (Paronich, Anthony)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer CarGuard Administration, Inc. answer due 6/8/2020. (Folan, Karen)
May 8, 2020 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 8, 2020 to File Answer by CarGuard Administration, Inc..(Shaw, Robert)
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Shaw on behalf of CarGuard Administration, Inc. (Shaw, Robert)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex M. Washkowitz on behalf of Matthew Silverman (Washkowitz, Alex)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex M. Washkowitz on behalf of Joseph Barrett (Washkowitz, Alex)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed CarGuard Administration, Inc. served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Paronich, Anthony)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Vehicle Protection Specialists LLC served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Paronich, Anthony)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Weyland, Loren)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Auto Protecht LLC, CarGuard Administration, Inc., Vehicle Protection Specialists LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8200563 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Joseph Barrett, Matthew Silverman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Form)(Paronich, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett et al v. CarGuard Administration, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Barrett
Represented By: Anthony I. Paronich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Silverman
Represented By: Anthony I. Paronich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vehicle Protection Specialists LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CarGuard Administration, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Protecht LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?