McGoldrick v. Morgan Stanley
Plaintiff: Kelley McGoldrick
Defendant: Morgan Stanley
Case Number: 1:2020cv10781
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kelley McGoldrick (Pontikes, Rebecca)
May 15, 2020 Filing 11 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Morgan Stanley answer due 6/8/2020. No further continuances. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 06/08/2020 to Respond to Complaint by Morgan Stanley.(Pesce, Kelly) (Modified on 5/14/2020 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly M. Pesce on behalf of Morgan Stanley (Pesce, Kelly)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Terence P. McCourt on behalf of Morgan Stanley (McCourt, Terence)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Morgan Stanley served on 4/27/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Pontikes, Rebecca)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Rosalind H. Herendeen and Ari M. Wilkenfeld. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ari M. Wilkenfeld Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8208211 by Kelley McGoldrick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Ari M. Wilkenfeld)(Pontikes, Rebecca)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rosalind H. Herendeen Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8208185 by Kelley McGoldrick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Rosalind H. Herendeen)(Pontikes, Rebecca)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Morgan Stanley. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Morgan Stanley Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8207884 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Kelley McGoldrick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Pontikes, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGoldrick v. Morgan Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley
Represented By: Terence P. McCourt
Represented By: Kelly M. Pesce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley McGoldrick
Represented By: Rebecca G. Pontikes
Represented By: Ari M. Wilkenfeld
Represented By: Rosalind H. Herendeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?