Wright v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Plaintiff: Shane Wright
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc., Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston and Smith & Nephew Inc. Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 1:2020cv10784
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Assented-To Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston answer due 7/31/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston identifying Corporate Parent The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston.. (Pomeroy, Scott)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 31, 2020 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Pomeroy, Scott)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Sullivan, M.)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Smith & Nephew Inc., Smith & Nephew Inc. Long Term Disability Plan. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8208170 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Shane Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit category form)(Sullivan, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Scott K. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc. Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Wright
Represented By: M. Katherine Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?