Kushimo v. Spaulding
Petitioner: Doherty Kushimo
Respondent: Spaulding
Case Number: 1:2020cv10821
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 20 Petitioner's Supplemental Brief in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) by Doherty Kushimo. (Montes, Mariliz)
May 29, 2020 Filing 19 Petitioner's Supplemental Brief in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) by Doherty Kushimo (Montes, Mariliz)
May 29, 2020 Filing 18 Electronic notice to counsel: This civil action has been transferred to the Western District of Pennsylvania and assigned civil case number 2:20-cv-00767. (Danieli, Chris)
May 27, 2020 Filing 17 DOCKET SHEET sent and copy of #13 Order mailed to Plaintiff on 5/27/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
May 27, 2020 Filing 16 Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of PA. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically to Clerk in that district. (Montes, Mariliz)
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. CLOSING ORDER DISMISSING CASE.(Montes, Mariliz)
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. Order of Transfer.(Montes, Mariliz)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. The Court DISMISSES #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Doherty Kushimo and TRANSFER this case to the Western District of Pennsylvania for assignment to Judge Cercone or another judge pursuant to the procedures of that court, for consideration and resolution of Kushimo's request for compassionate release. A copy of this Order has been mailed to the Petitioner.(Montes, Mariliz)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Document not scanned in accordance with General Orders re Pro Se litigants consent or refusal procedure. (Russo, Noreen)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 Copy re 9 Reminder to Submit Consent or Refusal of MJ Jurisdiction mailed to Doherty Kushimo on 5/22/20. (Russo, Noreen)
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. The parties should submit their documents in accordance with the procedures for Pro Se Prisoners. (Russo, Noreen)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eve A. Piemonte on behalf of Spaulding (Piemonte, Eve)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of Spaulding (Farquhar, Rayford)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. (PSSA, 5)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Spaulding NOTICE OF FILING OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Farquhar, Rayford)
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION Emergency Motion in Support of 28 U.S.C. 2241, seeking relief in light of an imminent threat of contracting Covid-19 by Doherty Kushimo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Doherty Kushimo. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Inmate statement)(Castilla, Francis)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Doherty Kushimo.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kushimo v. Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Doherty Kushimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?