Linhares v. Saul
Plaintiff: Andrew Saul and Jean Linhares
Case Number: 1:2020cv10899
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Summons, Civil Action. Social Security Administration served. Delivered on 6/17/2020. (Kelly, Danielle)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Procedural Order re Social Security Action (Kelly, Danielle)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Bolen on behalf of Andrew Saul (Bolen, Timothy)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Summons, Civil Action. U.S. Attorney, District of Massachusetts served Delivered on 6/16/2020. (Kelly, Danielle)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 USMS SERVICE INSTRUCTION NOTICE attached - Please note, Form USM 285 can be obtained from the Clerk's office or at https://www.usmarshals.gov/process/usm285.pdf (Hohler, Daniel)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Hohler, Daniel)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis "Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is ALLOWED. The Clerk shall issue summons. The plaintiff may elect to have service made by the United States Marshal Service. If directed by the plaintiff to do so, the United States Marshal shall serve the summons, complaint, and this Order upon the defendant, in the manner directed by the plaintiff, with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. Notwithstanding Local Rule 4.1, the plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of this Order to complete service. The plaintiff is responsible for providing the United States Marshals Service with all necessary papers for service." (Hohler, Daniel)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (DaSilva, Carolina)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jean Linhares.(Tierney, Gigi)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Fee Status: IFP requested), filed by Jean Linhares. (Attachments: #1 Category form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tierney, Gigi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linhares v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Linhares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?