Bishop v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: James Bishop
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv10945
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 Local Rule 16.1(d)(3) by Christopher DiBella on behalf of All Plaintiffs filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (DiBella, Christopher)
July 13, 2020 Filing 16 Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery to be completed by 3/1/2021. (Lyness, Paul)
July 13, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 12/7/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. OToole Jr.. Please make the change in your calendars.(Lyness, Paul)
July 13, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The scheduling conference set for Tuesday 7/14/20 is cancelled. (Lyness, Paul)
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered acknowledging #12 Joint Statement. The fact discovery deadline is March 1, 2021. The Clerk shall cancel the scheduling conference and set a status conference for December 7, 2020. The parties shall file a detailed joint status report no later than seven (7) days before the status conference. To the extent the parties believe that any further scheduling deadlines are necessary at that point, the parties shall propose a joint schedule.(Lyness, Paul)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference pursuant to Fed Rule 26(f) and Local Rule 16.1. (Christensen, Laurie)
July 9, 2020 Filing 11 Remark- The hearing is being held by telephone conference and that call-in information is available by contacting the courtroom deputy. (Lyness, Paul)
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 Defendant, Speedway LLC's Letter/request (non-motion) to participate in Scheduling Conference by Telephone on July 14, 2020. (Christensen, Laurie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. OToole Jr.. Please make the change in your calendars. (Lyness, Paul)
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to 7/20/2020 by James Bishop.(DiBella, Christopher)
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 6/29/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. OToole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly.(Lyness, Paul)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie L. Christensen on behalf of Speedway LLC (Christensen, Laurie)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Speedway LLC.(DiSarra, Luana)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT Record. (DiSarra, Luana)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McKillop, Matthew)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Speedway LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8245072 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(DiSarra, Luana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bishop
Represented By: Christopher DiBella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Luana DiSarra
Represented By: Laurie L. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?